Garcia v. Walker Engineering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miguel Garcia
Defendant: Walker Engineering, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv02682
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 Joint STATUS and Scheduling Report filed by Miguel Garcia. (Hofmeister, Martha) Modified text on 12/16/2021 (jmg).
November 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria L. Vish on behalf of Walker Engineering, Inc.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Vish, Victoria)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/29/2021) (jmg)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walker Engineering, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Comfort Systems USA, Inc. for Walker Engineering, Inc.. (Baker, Jana)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Walker Engineering, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Jana S Baker added to party Walker Engineering, Inc.(pty:dft) (Baker, Jana)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Walker Engineering, Inc; served on 11/5/2021. (jmg)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Walker Engineering, Inc. (jmg)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Walker Engineering, Inc. filed by Miguel Garcia. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12340185) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Hofmeister, Martha) Modified text per attorney on 10/28/2021 (jmg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Walker Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Garcia
Represented By: Martha Hardwick Hofmeister
Represented By: Michelle Morgan
Represented By: Michelle Alice Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walker Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Jana S Baker
Represented By: Victoria L. Vish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?