Wilson v. Superior Air Charter, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Marie Wilson
Defendant: Superior Air Charter, LLC, Deluxe Public Charter, LLC, Superior Air Charter LLC and Deluxe Public Charter LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv02891
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants Superior Air Charter, LLC, and Deluxe Public Charter, LLCs response to the complaint is due January 3, 2022. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/27/2021) (chmb)
December 22, 2021 Filing 7 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Deluxe Public Charter LLC, Superior Air Charter LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Matthew Paul Gizzo added to party Deluxe Public Charter LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Paul Gizzo added to party Superior Air Charter LLC(pty:dft) (Gizzo, Matthew)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Superior Air Charter LLC, served on 11/18/2021. (mla)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Deluxe Public Charter LLC, served on 11/18/2021. (mla)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Deluxe Public Charter LLC, Superior Air Charter LLC. (jmg)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lauren Marie Wilson. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Deluxe Public Charter, LLC, Superior Air Charter, LLC filed by Lauren Marie Wilson. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12394702) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (O'Kelly, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Superior Air Charter, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Marie Wilson
Represented By: Nicholas A O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Air Charter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deluxe Public Charter, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Air Charter LLC
Represented By: Matthew Paul Gizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deluxe Public Charter LLC
Represented By: Matthew Paul Gizzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?