Juluke v. Sunnyland Properties Ltd et al
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr
Defendant: Sunnyland Properties Ltd and Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP
Case Number: 3:2021cv02900
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 1/13/2022) (ykp)
January 12, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Clinton, Scot)
January 10, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunnyland Properties Ltd. (Hunt, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Sunnyland Properties Ltd re #1 Complaint,,,,, #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Hunt, Richard)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim() filed by Sunnyland Properties Ltd Attorney Richard M Hunt added to party Sunnyland Properties Ltd(pty:dft) (Hunt, Richard)
December 16, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sunnyland Properties Ltd; served on 12/11/2021. (Mussman, Louis)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP's answer due 1/12/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 12/14/2021) (chmb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Scot Clinton added to party Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP(pty:dft) (Clinton, Scot)
November 29, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP; served on 11/22/2021. (Mussman, Louis)
November 18, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP, Sunnyland Properties Ltd. (jmg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gerald J Smith, Sr on behalf of James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Smith, Gerald)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Mussman, Louis)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Mussman, Louis)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Mussman, Louis)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP, Sunnyland Properties Ltd filed by James Joseph Juluke, Jr. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12397884) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juluke v. Sunnyland Properties Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Juluke, Jr
Represented By: Louis I Mussman
Represented By: Gerald J Smith, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunnyland Properties Ltd
Represented By: Richard M Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gator Spring Valley Partners LLLP
Represented By: Scot Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?