Brown et al v. Crow et al
Plaintiff: Ella H Brown and Thomas G Brown
Defendant: Richard Crow, Wells Fargo Bank, Glenn Lynch Companies Inc, David Rhodes, Celeste Daffon, Kaufman County Sheriff's Office, Bryan Beavers, City of Terrell Texas Police Department, Jeff Brown, Mary Gayle Ramsy, P&E Construction Inc, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Netco Title Company, Deutsche Bank National Trust, Elizon Mortgage Trust Company, Kaufman County Tax Assessor, Brenda Samples, George Yarbrough, Jose Sanchez, Noe Sanchez, Gene's Tractor Repair, Lindsey Ray Smith, City of Kaufma, TX, City of Terrell, TX, City of Kaufman Police Department, Johnny Adams, Michael Shook, Casey Blair and Ray Wheless
Case Number: 3:2021cv02998
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1324
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown re: #17 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims. (ndt)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 REPLY filed by George Yarbrough re: #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dowis, Craig)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPLY filed by Casey Blair re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Graydon, Scot)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY filed by City of Kaufma, TX, City of Kaufman Police Department re: #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Davis, Robert)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY filed by City of Terrell Texas Police Department, City of Terrell, TX, Mary Gayle Ramsy, Michael Shook re: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Davis, Robert)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss. (ygl)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 RESPONSE filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown re: #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (ygl)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown re: #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (ygl)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Richard Crow re #38 MOTION to Dismiss (Davis, William)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown re: #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (ygl)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Richard Crow Attorney William Fields Davis added to party Richard Crow(pty:dft) (Davis, William)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss. (ygl)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Plaintiffs must file a response to Wells Fargo Bank's #16 Motion to Dismiss by 1/25/2022, Bryan Beavers's #17 Motion to Dismiss by 1/28/2022, Noe Sanchez's #28 Motion to Dismiss by 1/31/2022, Jose Sanchez's #30 Motion to Dismiss by 1/31/2022, and Deutsche Bank National Trust's #32 Motion to Dismiss by 2/4/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/18/2022) (mla)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:35. Tue Jan 18 15:27:29 CST 2022 (crt)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:36. Tue Jan 18 15:40:32 CST 2022 (crt)
January 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that ALL discovery and Rule 26 conference and scheduling requirements in this matter are STAYED until the Court rules upon any Motion to Dismiss or other dispositive motions which have been or may be filed by any of the Defendants herein. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/17/2022) (mla)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and MOTION for Abatement of any Order for Rule 26 Conference Pending Determination of Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Kaufma, TX, City of Kaufman Police Department, City of Terrell Texas Police Department, City of Terrell, TX, Mary Gayle Ramsy, Michael Shook (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Letter to Plaintiffs, #2 Exhibit(s) Email to Plaintiffs) (Davis, Robert) Modified event on 1/18/2022 (ygl).
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deutsche Bank National Trust identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Deutsche Bank AG for Deutsche Bank National Trust. (Whisler, Megan)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)Attorney Megan Renee Whisler added to party Deutsche Bank National Trust(pty:dft) (Whisler, Megan)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jose Sanchez re #30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Campbell, A)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jose Sanchez Attorney A Scott Campbell added to party Jose Sanchez(pty:dft) (Campbell, A)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Noe Sanchez re #28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Campbell, A)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Noe Sanchez Attorney A Scott Campbell added to party Noe Sanchez(pty:dft) (Campbell, A)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to P&E Construction Inc. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jose Sanchez; served on 12/20/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Richard Crow; served on 12/28/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ameriquest Mortgage Company; served on 12/21/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Deutsche Bank National Trust; served on 12/21/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Elizon Mortgage Trust Company; served on 12/21/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Michael Shook; served on 12/20/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Noe Sanchez; served on 12/20/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bryan Beavers; served on 12/14/2021; Casey Blair; served on 12/14/2021; City of Kaufman Police Department; served on 12/14/2021; City of Terrell Texas Police Department; served on 12/14/2021; Kaufman County Sheriff's Office; served on 12/14/2021; Mary Gayle Ramsy; served on 12/14/2021; Brenda Samples; served on 12/14/2021; Wells Fargo Bank; served on 12/14/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to George Yarbrough; served on 12/13/2021. (jmg)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims filed by Bryan Beavers with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney S Cass Weiland added to party Bryan Beavers(pty:dft) (Weiland, S)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Addison Fontein added to party Wells Fargo Bank(pty:dft) (Fontein, Addison)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:15. Tue Jan 4 12:08:19 CST 2022 (crt)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE: The Defendants who filed this Motion are ORDERED to confer with Plaintiffs and file a Certificate of Conference compliant with the local rules by 1/14/2022. In addition, the Court reminds Plaintiffs that they must serve all named defendants by 3/1/2022. Plaintiffs must file a response to Casey Blair's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #7 ) by January 19, the City of Terrell and City of Kaufmans Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. #10 & #11 ) by January 20, and George Yarbrough's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #13 ) by January 24. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/3/2022) (ygl)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of (Defendant Yarbrough's Joinder) re: #12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and any Rule 26 requirements filed by George Yarbrough (Horan, Thomas)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by George Yarbrough with Brief/Memorandum in Support. Attorney Thomas M Horan, II added to party George Yarbrough(pty:dft) (Horan, Thomas)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Discovery and MOTION for Abatement of any Order for Rule 26 Conference Pending Determination of Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Kaufma, TX, City of Kaufman Police Department, City of Terrell Texas Police Department, City of Terrell, TX, Mary Gayle Ramsy, Michael Shook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2022 (ygl).
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Kaufma, TX, City of Kaufman Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party City of Kaufma, TX(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party City of Kaufman Police Department(pty:dft) (Davis, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2022 (ygl).
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Terrell Texas Police Department, City of Terrell, TX, Mary Gayle Ramsy, Michael Shook. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party City of Terrell Texas Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party City of Terrell, TX(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Mary Gayle Ramsy(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Jacob Davis added to party Michael Shook(pty:dft) (Davis, Robert) Modified text on 1/3/2022 (ygl).
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown. (jmg)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Casey Blair re #7 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Graydon, Scot)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Casey Blair Attorney Scot M Graydon added to party Casey Blair(pty:dft) (Graydon, Scot)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Johnny Adams, Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Bryan Beavers, Casey Blair, Jeff Brown, City of Kaufma, TX, City of Kaufman Police Department, City of Terrell Texas Police Department, City of Terrell, TX, Richard Crow, Celeste Daffon, Deutsche Bank National Trust, Elizon Mortgage Trust Company, Gene's Tractor Repair, Glenn Lynch Companies Inc, Kaufman County Sheriff's Office, Kaufman County Tax Assessor, Netco Title Company, P&E Construction Inc, Mary Gayle Ramsy, David Rhodes, Brenda Samples, Jose Sanchez, Noe Sanchez, Michael Shook, Lindsey Ray Smith, Wells Fargo Bank, Ray Wheless. (axm)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown. (axm)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to #3 Complaint by Plaintiffs Ella H Brown, Thomas G Brown. (ndt)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Ameriquest Mortgage Company, Bryan Beavers, Jeff Brown, City of Terrell Texas Police Department, Richard Crow, Celeste Daffon, Glenn Lynch Companies Inc, Kaufman County Sheriff's Office, P&E Construction Inc, Mary Gayle Ramsy, David Rhodes, Wells Fargo Bank filed by Thomas G Brown, Ella H Brown. (Filing fee $402.00; Receipt number DS135169) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (ndt) *Note: Page numbers jump from 335 to 356* Modified on 12/1/2021 (axm).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Wed Dec 1 15:41:55 CST 2021 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Crow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella H Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas G Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Crow
Represented By: William Fields Davis
Represented By: Ted B Lyon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Lynch Companies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celeste Daffon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaufman County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Beavers
Represented By: S Cass Weiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Terrell Texas Police Department
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Gayle Ramsy
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&E Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriquest Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netco Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust
Represented By: Megan Renee Whisler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizon Mortgage Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaufman County Tax Assessor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Samples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Yarbrough
Represented By: Craig L Dowis
Represented By: Thomas M Horan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Sanchez
Represented By: A Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noe Sanchez
Represented By: A Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene's Tractor Repair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsey Ray Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kaufma, TX
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Terrell, TX
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kaufman Police Department
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Shook
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Blair
Represented By: Scot M Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Wheless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?