Jacobs v. Experian LLC
Plaintiff: Jake Tayler Jacobs
Defendant: Experian LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00312
Filed: February 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff Jake Tayler Jacobs must address the following deficiency: A review of the docket reveals that Plaintiff has not yet registered as a user of the Court's electronic filing system, as required by Local Civil Rule. Therefore, no later than April 12, 2022, Plaintiff is ORDERED to register to use the Court's electronic filing system or show good cause why he should be excused from that requirement. Instructions for registering as a pro se litigant may be found online at https:// ecf.txnd.uscourts.gov/AttorneyReg. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION UNDER FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 3/22/2022) (chmb)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 DISREGARD - Entered in error. (rekc)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY. Plaintiff Jake Tayler Jacobs must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff did not pay the required filing and administrative fees of $402.00 or submit a request to proceed in forma pauperis on the court approved form. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915(a); Misc. Ord. 15 (requiring a party desiring to proceed without prepaying fees and costs to file a motion on the AO 239 form). Further, a review of the docket reveals that Plaintiff has not yet registered as a user of the Court's electronic filing system, as required. Instructions for registering are found online at https://ecf.txnd.uscourts.gov/AttorneyReg/. Therefore, Plaintiff is ORDERED to (1) pay the required filing and administrative fees of $402.00 or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 form, and (2) register to use the Court's electronic filing system, by March 2, 2022. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b).A motion to proceed in forma pauperis on the AO 239 form is available online at http://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/forms/AO239_0.pdf. No process will issue unless ordered by the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 2/9/2022) (chmb)
February 8, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Experian LLC filed by Jake Tayler Jacobs. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ndt)
February 8, 2022 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (ndt)
February 8, 2022 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
February 8, 2022 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Feb 8 15:48:58 CST 2022 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobs v. Experian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Tayler Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?