Segovia v. LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC
Plaintiff: Rafael Segovia
Defendant: LGL OAK LAWN PROPERTIES, LLC and LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv00364
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set for 1/30/2023 before Judge David C Godbey. The setting is set for one week docket. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 4/8/2022) (axm)
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT filed by Rafael Segovia. (Strickland, Duncan)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/21/2022) (axm)
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC. (O'Dens, David)
March 17, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David M O'Dens added to party LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC(pty:dft) (O'Dens, David)
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT by Rafael Segovia. (Strickland, Duncan)
February 25, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC; served on 2/22/2022. (jmg)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Business Reply Card signed by USMO; re #1 Complaint, #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #5 Summons Issued. Signed on 2/16/2022. (oyh)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC. (oyh)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND ORDERING SERVICE OF PROCESS: The Clerk of the Court shall issue summons for each named defendant and deliver the summons and a copy of the complaint to the United States Marshal's Service. After docketing this order, the Clerk of the Court shall terminate the referral of this case to a magistrate judge based on the completion of initial screening as provided by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 2/16/2022) (oyh)
February 14, 2022 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (mjr)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rafael Segovia. (See document #1 for image.) (mjr)
February 14, 2022 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rafael Segovia. (See document #1 for image.) (mjr)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LGL OAK LAWN PROPERTIES, LLC filed by Rafael Segovia. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Clerk to issue summons(es) if the motion to proceed IFP is granted. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Proposed Order) (Strickland, Duncan) (Attachment 1 replaced to flatten on 2/15/2022) (mjr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Segovia v. LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Segovia
Represented By: Duncan Harold Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGL OAK LAWN PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LGL Oak Lawn Properties LLC
Represented By: David M O'Dens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?