Chaisson et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dennis J Chaisson and Lisa M Bulthaup
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2022cv00540
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (Kimball, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ***DUPLICATE FILING.*** SUMMONS Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney. (Kimball, Mark) Modified text on 4/15/2022 (mjr). Modified text on 4/15/2022 (jmg).
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Proof of Service as to the US Attorney. (Kimball, Mark) Modified event text on 4/15/2022 (jmg).
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel Pursuant to N.D. Tex. Local Rules 83.1 and 83.10 (the "Motion") (Doc. No. 6). Having carefully considered the Motion along with the associated brief and appendix, the Court GRANTS the Motion. However, Plaintiffs are advised that they may later be required to retain local counsel if the Court deems it necessary. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/22/2022) (chmb)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Appendix in Support filed by Lisa M Bulthaup, Dennis J Chaisson re #6 MOTION Proceed Without Local Counsel, #7 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of M.Kimball) (Kimball, Mark)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Lisa M Bulthaup, Dennis J Chaisson re #6 MOTION Proceed Without Local Counsel (Kimball, Mark)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Lisa M Bulthaup, Dennis J Chaisson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kimball, Mark) Modified text on 3/11/2022 (ygl).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 (Document Restricted) Sealed Attorney Contact Information (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Lisa M Bulthaup, Dennis J Chaisson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Attorney Contact Information) (Kimball, Mark)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, within twenty days of this date, plaintiffs Dennis J. Chaisson and Lisa M. Bulthaup, shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case without prejudice and without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/8/2022) (chmb)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jmg)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lisa M Bulthaup, Dennis J Chaisson. (See document #1 - 2 for image.) (jmg)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Lisa M Bulthaup, Dennis J Chaisson. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12650183) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cert. of Interested Persons) (Kimball, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaisson et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J Chaisson
Represented By: Mark Douglas Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M Bulthaup
Represented By: Mark Douglas Kimball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?