Lauchner v. Cannon Young Properties LP
Plaintiff: Jason Lauchner
Defendant: Cannon Young Properties LP
Case Number: 3:2022cv00601
Filed: March 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The deadline for Defendant Cannon Young Properties LP to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is June 2, 2022. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 4/20/2022) (chmb)
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Cannon Young Properties LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Mtn to Extend Time To Answer)Attorney Kevin Elder Barnett added to party Cannon Young Properties LP(pty:dft) (Barnett, Kevin)
March 16, 2022 CASE Returned to District Judge; Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford no longer assigned to case. (cea)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER returning this case to the District Judge. This case was referred to the Magistrate Judge for judicial screening. The screening is complete. Accordingly, the case is returned to the District Judge for any further action that may be appropriate. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/16/2022) (chmb)
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cannon Young Properties LP. (jmg)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. However, because Plaintiff is represented by counsel, the Court directs his attorney to serve Defendant with a summons and complaint in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4 and file proof of service with the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/16/2022) (jmg)
March 15, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jason Lauchner (ykp)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jason Lauchner. (ykp)
March 15, 2022 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
March 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cannon Young Properties LP filed by Jason Lauchner. (Filer fee note- IFP motion in complaint or to be filed) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Summons) (Sapp, Matthew) Modified text on 3/15/2022 (ykp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lauchner v. Cannon Young Properties LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lauchner
Represented By: Matthew Brantley Sapp
Represented By: K Michael Sturgill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cannon Young Properties LP
Represented By: Kevin Elder Barnett
Represented By: James E Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?