Brooks v. Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Tracy Brooks
Defendant: Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC
Case Number: 3:2022cv01123
Filed: May 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Bailey, Lawrence)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Lawrence W Bailey added to party Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC(pty:dft) (Bailey, Lawrence)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Responsive Pleading [ECF No. 9]. The deadline for Defendant to file its Answer is extended to June 30, 2022. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/17/2022) (chmb)
June 16, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading filed by Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Le Brocq, Stephen)
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Le Brocq on behalf of Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Le Brocq, Stephen)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC, served on 5/25/2022. (Agruss, Michael)
May 21, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dena L Mathis for Michael S. Agruss on behalf of Tracy Brooks. (Mathis, Dena)
May 20, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC. (ygl)
May 20, 2022 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ygl)
May 20, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Tracy Brooks. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Agruss, Michael)
May 20, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Tracy Brooks. (Agruss, Michael)
May 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC filed by Tracy Brooks. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12839227) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Brooks
Represented By: Michael S Agruss
Represented By: Dena L Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Cruz & Associates LLC
Represented By: Stephen Le Brocq
Represented By: Evan William Horner
Represented By: Lawrence W Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?