Triumph IP LLC v. B Braun Medical Inc
Plaintiff: Triumph IP LLC
Defendant: B Braun Medical Inc
Case Number: 3:2022cv01177
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. B Braun Medical Inc answer due by 8/18/2022. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 7/19/2022) (oyh)
July 19, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Thomas Nilsson on behalf of B Braun Medical Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Nilsson, William)
July 19, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Blake Thomas Dietrich on behalf of B Braun Medical Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Dietrich, Blake)
July 19, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathaniel St Clair, II on behalf of B Braun Medical Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (St Clair, Nathaniel)
July 18, 2022 Filing 10 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Triumph IP LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bennett, David)
June 30, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to B Braun Medical Inc; served on 6/28/2022. (Ni, Hao)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David R. Bennett. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 6/6/2022) (chmb)
June 5, 2022 Filing 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12871209) filed by Triumph IP LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Admission - Bennett, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney David R Bennett added to party Triumph IP LLC(pty:pla) (Bennett, David)
May 31, 2022 Filing 6 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (sxf)
May 31, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to B Braun Medical Inc. (sxf)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Triumph IP LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ni, Hao)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (AO120) filed by Triumph IP LLC (Ni, Hao)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against B. Braun Medical Inc. filed by Triumph IP LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12859485) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Cover Sheet) (Ni, Hao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triumph IP LLC v. B Braun Medical Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triumph IP LLC
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: David R Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Braun Medical Inc
Represented By: Nathaniel St Clair, II
Represented By: Blake Thomas Dietrich
Represented By: William Thomas Nilsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?