Coleman v. Mayorkas
Plaintiff: Nina Marie Coleman
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Case Number: 3:2022cv01524
Filed: July 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Barbara M G Lynn
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Requesting Case to be transferred to US District Court of Colombia filed by Nina Marie Coleman. (sxf)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Second Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire sent to NINA MARIE COLEMAN. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/23/2022) (mcrd)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Tue Aug 23 15:52:21 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Answers filed by Nina Marie Coleman re: #7 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire. ***FILED USING THE EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (twd)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Receipt of Letter filed by Nina Marie Coleman. ***FILED USING THE EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (twd)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Update on Extension for Questionnaire filed by Nina Marie Coleman ***FILED USING EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (Attachments: #1 Updated Counter Settlement Offer) (rekc)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: the plaintiff's request for an extension of time, filed on 8/9/2022 (doc. #11 ). The motion is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's deadline to file her answers to a Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire is extended until 8/19/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/11/2022) (mcrd)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. Thu Aug 11 13:31:59 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire filed by Nina Marie Coleman. ***FILED USING THE EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (cea)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10. Wed Aug 3 11:40:40 CDT 2022 (crt)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: #9 The motion is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's deadline to file her answers to a Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire is extended until August 5, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 8/2/2022) (svc)
July 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire filed by Nina Marie Coleman. ***FILED USING THE EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (twd)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request to be Removed from Electronic Filing filed by Nina Marie Coleman. ***FILED USING THE EMERGENCY FILING EMAIL*** (rekc) Modified on 8/2/2022 (frw).
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Questionnaire sent to NINA MARIE COLEMAN. Deadline to respond to the questionnaire is 14 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/19/2022) (mcrd)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the #4 Application to Proceed In District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 7/19/2022) (mcrd)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nina Marie Coleman. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (sxf)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nina Marie Coleman. (sxf)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Alejandro Mayorkas filed by Nina Marie Coleman. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sxf)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sxf)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Marie Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?