Kenney et al v. Exactech Inc et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Kenney and Laura Kenney
Defendant: Exactech, Inc., Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech Inc doing business as Exactech and Exactech US Inc doing business as Exactech
Case Number: 3:2022cv01554
Filed: July 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Pers Inj/Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #21 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Therefore, IT IS ORDERED all deadlines in this matter, including the deadline for the Scheduling Conference, are extended until after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation hearing currently scheduled to occur on September 29, and until such time as the Panel has issued its ruling regarding the status of the MDL. This case is hereby STAYED. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/23/2022) (chmb)
August 22, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Scheduling Conference filed by Exactech Inc, Exactech US Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Handy, Katherine) Modified text on 8/23/2022 (ygl).
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #19 Letter Request for Extension to Extend Time without prejudice. Defendants' may re-urge their request by filing a proper motion with the Court that complies with this Court's local rules. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/22/2022) (chmb)
August 19, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Extend Time Scheduling Conference filed by Exactech Inc, Exactech US Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Handy, Katherine)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/12/2022) (chmb)
August 11, 2022 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exactech US Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Handy, Katherine)
August 11, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exactech Inc, Exactech US Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Handy, Katherine)
August 11, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Exactech Inc, Exactech US Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Handy, Katherine)
August 11, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Exactech Inc, Exactech US Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Katherine Michelle Handy added to party Exactech Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Michelle Handy added to party Exactech US Inc(pty:dft) (Handy, Katherine)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joel Bieber. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/10/2022) (chmb)
August 8, 2022 Filing 12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Joel Bieber (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13016448) filed by Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Service) (Binstock, Melissa)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Fry Hague. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/5/2022) (chmb)
August 5, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Binstock on behalf of Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Service) (Binstock, Melissa)
August 5, 2022 Filing 9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Melissa Fry Hague (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-13011477) filed by Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Service)Attorney Melissa Binstock added to party Kevin Kenney(pty:pla), Attorney Melissa Binstock added to party Laura Kenney(pty:pla) (Binstock, Melissa)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert K Jenner. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/3/2022) (chmb)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kathleen R Kerner. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 8/3/2022) (chmb)
July 27, 2022 Filing 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12990459) filed by Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)Attorney Robert K Jenner added to party Kevin Kenney(pty:pla), Attorney Robert K Jenner added to party Laura Kenney(pty:pla) (Jenner, Robert) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2022: #4 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing - Maryland) (chmb).
July 27, 2022 Filing 5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-12990237) filed by Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)Attorney Kathleen R Kerner added to party Kevin Kenney(pty:pla), Attorney Kathleen R Kerner added to party Laura Kenney(pty:pla) (Kerner, Kathleen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2022: #4 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing - Maryland) (chmb).
July 22, 2022 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Patel, Shreedhar)
July 19, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Exactech Inc, Exactech US Inc. (sxf)
July 18, 2022 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
July 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Exactech U.S., Inc., Exactech, Inc. filed by Kevin Kenney, Laura Kenney. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12970937) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) Summons to Def. Exactech, Inc., #3 Additional Page(s) Summons to Def. Exactech U.S., Inc.) (Patel, Shreedhar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kenney et al v. Exactech Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Kenney
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Represented By: Joel Bieber
Represented By: Kathleen R Kerner
Represented By: Melissa Binstock
Represented By: Melissa Hague
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Kenney
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Represented By: Joel Bieber
Represented By: Kathleen R Kerner
Represented By: Melissa Binstock
Represented By: Melissa Hague
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech Inc doing business as Exactech
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US Inc doing business as Exactech
Represented By: Katherine Michelle Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?