Johnson v. Johnson County
Plaintiff: Randy Lee Johnson
Defendant: Johnson County
Case Number: 3:2022cv02397
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sidney A Fitzwater
Referring Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT: This action came on for consideration by the court, and the issues having been duly considered and a decision duly rendered, it is ordered and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915A, and this dismissal counts as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/22/2022) (mcrd)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Adopting #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint filed by Randy Lee Johnson. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 12/22/2022) (mcrd)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10,11. Thu Dec 22 15:02:51 CST 2022 (crt)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Mail returned as undeliverable. #5 Findings and Recommendations on Case re: #3 Complaint filed by Randy Lee Johnson. received back from Randy Lee Johnson as Return to Sender- Refused-Unable to Forward. Address updated from last filed document, #7 . New address: TDCJ Glossbrenner Unit 5100 South FM 1329 San Diego, TX 78384. The current document has been re-mailed on 11/22/2022. (ykp)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Mail returned as undeliverable. #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, received back from Randy Lee Johnson as Return to Sender- Refused-Unable to Forward. Address updated from last filed document, #7 . New address: TDCJ Glossbrenner Unit 5100 South FM 1329 San Diego, TX 78384. The current document has been re-mailed on 11/22/2022. (ykp)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. remailed to TDCJ Glossbrenner Unit 5100 South FM 1329 San Diego, TX 78384 Tue Nov 22 18:06:09 CST 2022 (crt)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Randy Lee Johnson. New address: TDCJ Glossbrenner Unit, 5100 South FM 1329, San Diego, TX 78384. (axm)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. and sent to Johnson County Inmate Trust Mon Nov 14 11:23:10 CST 2022 (crt)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PLRA FILING FEE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Service of process shall be withheld pending further judicial screening under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and/or 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/10/2022) (ndt) Modified on 11/28/2022 (mcrd).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should dismiss this case with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915A (because the claims are frivolous) and count this dismissal as a strike under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/10/2022) (mcrd)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 5. Thu Nov 10 16:40:58 CST 2022 (crt)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with certificate of trust account filed by Randy Lee Johnson. (mms)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Johnson County filed by Randy Lee Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mms)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mms)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Thu Oct 27 11:32:38 CDT 2022 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Johnson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Lee Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?