Gilbert v. USA
Petitioner: Freddie Thomas Gilbert
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2022cv02465
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jane J Boyle
Referring Judge: Irma Carrillo Ramirez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Brian W McKay-DOJ for USA Leigha A Simonton-DOJ terminated. (Attachments: #1 Case List) (cea) Modified on 12/8/2022 (cea).
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Amanda R Burch-DOJ added as AUSA. (Burch-DOJ, Amanda)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order to Show Cause, Notice, and Instructions to Parties. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. The United States Attorney shall file an answer or response to the motion within 60 days of service, answering in substance as required by Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2255 Proceedings in the United States District Courts. Deadline to reply to the answer is 30 days. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 11/4/2022) (ndt)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Fri Nov 4 11:25:16 CDT 2022 (crt)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (oyh)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Thu Nov 3 14:32:04 CDT 2022 (crt)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Freddie Thomas Gilbert re #1 Motion to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (oyh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 3:17-cr-569) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (oyh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) (oyh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Freddie Thomas Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Amanda R Burch-DOJ
Represented By: Brian W McKay-DOJ
Represented By: Leigha A Simonton-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?