Turner et al v. Cisco Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner, Wipro-Holdings and Wipro-Limited
Defendant: Cisco Corporation, USSOCOM, FBI, CIA, NSA, Geo Spatial and GCHQ
Case Number: 3:2023cv01011
Filed: May 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Brantley Starr
2 Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Cause Nos. 3:23-cv-00987-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00988-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00990-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00991-X-BK, 3:23-cv-00992-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01006-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01007-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01008-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01009-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01010-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01011-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01012-X-BK, 3:23-cv-01013-X-BK, and 3:23-cv-01014-X-BK are CONSOLIDATED. Henceforth all pleadings will be filed in No. 3:23-cv-00987-X-BK. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close all member cases and terminate all motions in the member cases. Also, the parties in the member cases will not be added to the lead case and all future filings will be docketed only in the lead case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 5/19/2023) (axm) Modified text on 5/19/2023 (axm).
May 19, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of document 7 Fri May 19 12:44:06 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brantley Starr for all further proceedings. Judge Ada Brown no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 5/17/2023) (chmb)
May 17, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed May 17 15:45:05 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 9, 2023 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue May 9 10:50:48 CDT 2023 (crt)
May 4, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons filed by Terrance Turner. (cfk)
May 4, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Terrance Turner. (cfk)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against CIA, Cisco Corporation, FBI, GCHQ, Geo Spatial, NSA, USSOCOM filed by Terrance Turner. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cfk)
May 4, 2023 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
May 4, 2023 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. (For court use only - links to the #national index and to the prior sanctions found within the #circuit index.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner et al v. Cisco Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wipro-Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wipro-Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USSOCOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geo Spatial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCHQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?