Flex LLC v. Stubblefield and Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Flex, LLC f/k/a Cloudtrucks Flex, LLC, Flex LLC and Cloudtrucks Flex LLC
Defendant: Stubblefield and Associates, LLC and Stubblefield and Associates LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv01295
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: The Joint Proposal shall be filed on or before 9/25/2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 7/7/2023) (twd)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Stubblefield and Associates LLC; served on 6/27/2023. (agc)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 6/15/2023) (axm)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Stubblefield and Associates LLC. (acm)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (acm)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements filed by Flex, LLC f/k/a Cloudtrucks Flex, LLC (Henry, Vic)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Flex, LLC f/k/a Cloudtrucks Flex, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Henry, Vic)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Stubblefield and Associates, LLC filed by Flex, LLC f/k/a Cloudtrucks Flex, LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13801600) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Factoring Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Fraudulent Accounts, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Demand-Amount Due, #4 Cover Sheet) (Henry, Vic)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flex LLC v. Stubblefield and Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flex, LLC f/k/a Cloudtrucks Flex, LLC
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flex LLC
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Represented By: John C Gentile
Represented By: Kevin M Capuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cloudtrucks Flex LLC
Represented By: Vic H Henry
Represented By: John C Gentile
Represented By: Kevin M Capuzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stubblefield and Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stubblefield and Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?