Ferrari Financial Services Inc v. Yoo et al
Plaintiff: Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. and Ferrari Financial Services Inc
Defendant: Danny S. Yoo, DSY LLC and Danny S Yoo
Case Number: 3:2023cv01572
Filed: July 13, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2023 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to DSY LLC ; served on 8/14/2023. (Greenup, Adam)
July 28, 2023 Filing 14 Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ferrari Financial Services Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Greenup, Adam) Modified text on 8/1/2023 (sxf).
July 28, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ferrari Financial Services Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-D) (Greenup, Adam)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER - Before the Court is the Motion to Withdraw and be Removed from CM/ECF Service List (the "Motion"). Doc. No. 11. Having read and considered the Motion, and finding good cause therefore, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Jennifer L. McBee is hereby removed as counsel for Plaintiff Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. and from the CM/ECF service list. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/24/2023) (chmb)
July 21, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and be Removed from CM/ECF Service List filed by Ferrari Financial Services Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McBee, Jennifer)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Federal courts are vested with subject matter jurisdiction over all civil actions "arising under the Constitution, laws, or treaties of the United States," or where the case in controversy exceeds $75,000 and is between citizens of different states, or between citizens of a state and citizens or subjects of a foreign state. 28 U.S.C. 1331, 1332(a)(1)-(2). Accordingly, by July 28, 2023, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to amend its Complaint to properly reflect the citizenship of Defendants Danny S. You and DSY LLC. Furthermore, each party's Certificate of Interested Persons / Disclosure Statement must properly reflect the citizenship of Plaintiff and Defendant. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/18/2023) (chmb)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is the Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel Within the Same Law Firm for Plaintiff Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. (the "Notice"). Doc. No. 8. Per N.D. Tex. L. Civ. R. 83.12, "an attorney desiring to withdraw in any case must file a motion to withdraw." The Notice is not a motion. Thus, by July 21, 2023, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a motion to withdraw in compliance with N.D. Tex. L. Civ. R. 83.12. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 7/18/2023) (chmb)
July 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Within the Same Law Firm for Plaintiff Ferrari Financial Services, Inc. filed by Ferrari Financial Services Inc (McBee, Jennifer)
July 17, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Joseph Greenup on behalf of Ferrari Financial Services Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Greenup, Adam)
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to DSY LLC, Danny S Yoo. (mms)
July 13, 2023 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mms)
July 13, 2023 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons - DSY LLC filed by Ferrari Financial Services Inc. (McBee, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/14/2023 (mms).
July 13, 2023 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons - Danny S Yoo filed by Ferrari Financial Services Inc. (McBee, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/14/2023 (mms).
July 13, 2023 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ferrari Financial Services Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (McBee, Jennifer) Modified text on 7/14/2023 (mms).
July 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DSY LLC, Danny S Yoo filed by Ferrari Financial Services Inc. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13881685) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Cover Sheet) (McBee, Jennifer) Modified parties on 7/14/2023 (mms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrari Financial Services Inc v. Yoo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrari Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lustig McBee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrari Financial Services Inc
Represented By: Jennifer Lustig McBee
Represented By: Adam Joseph Greenup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny S. Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny S Yoo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?