McConnell v. Applied Digital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Philip McConnell
Defendant: Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins and David Rench
Petitioner: Phillip Ellis, Craig Medley, Irina Oren and Mark Manion
Case Number: 3:2023cv01805
Filed: August 12, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2023 Filing 17 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Mark Manion re #16 MOTION OF MARK MANION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Willie Briscoe, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F) (Briscoe, Willie)
October 11, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION OF MARK MANION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF COUNSEL filed by Mark Manion (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Mark Manion added.Attorney Willie Briscoe added to party Mark Manion(pty:mov) (Briscoe, Willie)
October 11, 2023 Filing 15 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Irina Oren re #14 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Thane Tyler Sponsel III, #2 Exhibit(s) A - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Press Release, #5 Exhibit(s) D - Client Declaration, #6 Exhibit(s) E - Firm Resumes) (Sponsel, Thane)
October 11, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel filed by Irina Oren (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Irina Oren added.Attorney Thane Tyler Sponsel, III added to party Irina Oren(pty:mov) (Sponsel, Thane)
October 11, 2023 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Craig Medley re #12 MOTION of Craig Medley for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Joe Kendall, #2 Exhibit(s) A - PSLRA Notice, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Certification, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Financial Interest Analysis, #5 Exhibit(s) D - GPM Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit(s) E - KLG Firm Resume) (Kendall, Joe)
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION of Craig Medley for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Counsel filed by Craig Medley (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party Craig Medley added. (Kendall, Joe)
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart L Cochran on behalf of Phillip Ellis. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Cochran, Stuart)
October 11, 2023 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Phillip Ellis re #9 MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION OF PHILLIP ELLIS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF COUNSEL (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Stuart L. Cochran ISO of Phillip Ellis' Motion for Lead Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-5) (Cochran, Stuart)
October 11, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION OF PHILLIP ELLIS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF LEAD PLAINTIFF'S SELECTION OF COUNSEL filed by Phillip Ellis (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Party PHILLIP ELLIS added.Attorney Stuart L Cochran added to party Phillip Ellis(pty:mov) (Cochran, Stuart)
October 3, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noelle M Reed for Ralph H. Duggins and Katherine Hancock on behalf of Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins, David Rench. (Reed, Noelle)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #6 Motion Before the Court is Defendants Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins, and David Rench's Unopposed Motion to Approve Local Counsel Resident in the Northern District of Texas. Having reviewed the Motion IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is hereby DENIED. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 9/15/2023) (chmb)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION To Approve Local Counsel Resident in the Northern District of Texas filed by Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins, David Rench (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Reed, Noelle)
September 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Noelle M Reed on behalf of Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins, David Rench. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Reed, Noelle)
August 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Errata re: #1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Philip McConnell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) A-1) (Briscoe, Willie)
August 14, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins, David Rench. (agc)
August 12, 2023 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
August 12, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Applied Digital Corporation, Wesley Cummins, David Rench filed by Philip McConnell. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13951741) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet) (Briscoe, Willie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell v. Applied Digital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip McConnell
Represented By: Willie Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Applied Digital Corporation
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Represented By: Katherine R Hancock
Represented By: Ralph H Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Cummins
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Represented By: Katherine R Hancock
Represented By: Ralph H Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Rench
Represented By: Noelle M Reed
Represented By: Katherine R Hancock
Represented By: Ralph H Duggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Ellis
Represented By: Stuart L Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Craig Medley
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Irina Oren
Represented By: Thane Tyler Sponsel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mark Manion
Represented By: Willie Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?