Builders Group LLC v. Hopkins
Plaintiff: Builders Group, LLC and Builders Group LLC
Defendant: Travis Hopkins and Skilld Labs
Case Number: 3:2023cv02492
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Brantley Starr
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Return of Service Executed on 12/18/2023 as to Skilld Labs re: #18 Summons Issued. (kaf)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Travis Hopkins ; served on 12/15/2023. (ndt)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY filed by Builders Group LLC re: #38 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) (Hail, Eric)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Redact Limited Information in Memorandum Opinion and Order Granting Preliminary Injunction re #50 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Order filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
December 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Skilld Labs; served on 11/21/2023. (kcr)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Case Stayed per #50 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (rekc)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Civil Case Terminated per #50 Memorandum opinion and Order Granting Preliminary Injuction. (rekc)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiffs have filed their amended Motion For Leave to File Under Seal. (Doc. #38 ). This MOOTS Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Sealed Pleadings. (Doc. 34]). If Defendants wish to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, such a response is due within 7 days from the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/1/2023) (chmb)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 (Document Restricted) Memorandum Opinion and Order GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendants are ENJOINED from breaching Sections 2, 5, and 6 of the employment agreement. The attached Order also disposes of a number of motions on the docket. The attached Order is currently under seal. If any party in this case wishes to assert that material contained within this Order is confidential, such a party has a right to file a motion and supporting declaration asserting which portions of the Order shall remain sealed. Such a motion should be filed within 7 days from the date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/1/2023) (chmb) Docket text modified on 12/4/2023 (twd).
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPLY filed by Travis Hopkins re: #43 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Registration in Texas (McAllister, Greg)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re: #38 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McAllister, Greg)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Appendix in Support filed by Builders Group LLC re #46 Response/Objection (Huffman, Edwin)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE filed by Builders Group LLC re: #43 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Registration in Texas (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Huffman, Edwin)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Emergency Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Registration in Texas. (Doc. #43 ). Plaintiff Builders Group is INSTRUCTED to file a response to Defendants' Motion by December 1, 2023 at 5:00 pm central time. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 12/1/2023) (chmb)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Appendix in Support filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re #43 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Registration in Texas (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) and Exhibits) (McAllister, Greg)
December 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Emergency MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Registration in Texas filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McAllister, Greg)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #39 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sara Schretenthaler Staha; Weston J Mumme and Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian terminated. Attorney Greg McAllister of Rogge Dunn Group, PC is substituted as counsel of record for Defendants Travis Hopkins and SKILLD LABS, LLC. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/30/2023) (chmb)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re: #37 MOTION to Strike #33 Sur-reply and In the Alternative, to Respond to the New Issues Rasied (McAllister, Greg)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File SurReply Supporting Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McAllister, Greg)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Lead Counsel filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staha, Sara)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Amended Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric) Modified security main document and the first attachment per chambers on 12/1/2023 (cea).
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Strike #33 Sur-reply and In the Alternative, to Respond to the New Issues Rasied filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff Builders Group LLC is INSTRUCTED to file a motion for leave to file under seal. In its motion, Builders Group LLC needs to comply with the Fifth Circuit's sealing requirements, including (1) identifying precisely what information (pages, lines, etc.) the party wants sealed; (2) conducting a line-by-line, page-by-page analysis explaining and briefing why the risks of disclosure outweigh the public's right to know; and (3) explaining why no other viable alternative to sealing exists. Further, all facts recited in any such motion must be verified by the oath or declaration of a person or persons with personal knowledge, which will assist the Court in making fact findings that can withstand appellate scrutiny. Builders Group LLC's motion must be filed by noon, central time, on November 29, 2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/28/2023) (chmb)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Related Case filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs (McAllister, Greg)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's "Sealed" Pleadings filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (McAllister, Greg)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Sur-reply filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re: #12 MOTION for Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (McAllister, Greg)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY filed by Builders Group LLC re: #12 MOTION for Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (Hail, Eric)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE filed by Builders Group LLC re: #24 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Exhibits to Motion for Temporary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief In Support (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Re-Filiing (Unredacted Copy of Motion for Preliminary Injunction re: #14 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Hail, Eric)
November 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of CERTIFICATE REGARDING JUDGE-SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs (McAllister, Greg)
November 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Greg Patrick McAllister on behalf of Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (McAllister, Greg)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Appendix in Support filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re #25 Response/Objection to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Staha, Sara)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re: #12 MOTION for Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staha, Sara)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Exhibits to Motion for Temporary Injunction filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staha, Sara)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Appendix in Support filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and Alternative Motion to Compel Arbitration (Staha, Sara)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and Alternative Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Staha, Sara)
November 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Travis Hopkins, Skilld Labs with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Sara Schretenthaler Staha added to party Skilld Labs(pty:dft) (Staha, Sara)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Appendix in Support filed by Builders Group LLC re #19 MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery and For Show Cause (Hail, Eric)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Compel Expedited Discovery and For Show Cause filed by Builders Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Skilld Labs. (ndt)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Builders Group LLC. (Hail, Eric)
November 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #14 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Hail, Eric)
November 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ***Disregard entry, see Document #16 for correct image*** (Document Restricted) Sealed Appendix in Support re: #14 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Hail, Eric) Modified text on 11/20/2023 (cfk).
November 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Hail, Eric)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Appendix in Support filed by Builders Group LLC re #12 MOTION for Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support (Hail, Eric)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support filed by Builders Group LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Hail, Eric)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (Document Restricted) Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Sealed pursuant to SO 19-1, statute, or rule) filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3) (Hail, Eric)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Builders Group LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Hail, Eric)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Appendix in Support of Builders Groups Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Brief in Support and First Amended Complaint Under Seal filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Emergency Request for Ruling on Pending Motion to Extend Temporary Restraining Order. The Court ORDERS Defendant Hopkins to continue to comply with the terms of the Court's TRO until 11:59 p.m. on 12/1/2023. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/13/2023) (axm)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Hail, Eric)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time to Extend Temporary Restraining Order filed by Builders Group LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order) (Hail, Eric)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Electronic Standing Order - If they have not already done so, all attorneys appearing in this case must file a Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements on the docket attesting that they have read, and will comply with, the judge-specific requirements for this Court, including the Court's order concerning generative artificial intelligence. The judge-specific requirements and a template Certificate may be found at: # Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. To file the Certificate, please use the event entitled Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. This event is located in the Other Documents selection, which is under the Other Filings category of the Civil page in ECF. Please contact the ECF help desk at 214-753-2633 for filing assistance. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/9/2023) (oyh)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Travis Hopkins. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Please see document [ #1 -3] for image) (oyh)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Travis Hopkins (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Certificate Regarding Judge-Specific Requirements. (Sarokhanian, Nicholas)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Travis Hopkins. (Filer fee $402- Receipt number ATXNDC-14162590) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Index of Documents Filed in State Court, and Documents Filed in State Court, #2 Docket Sheet from State Court, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties) (Sarokhanian, Nicholas) Modified docket text on 11/9/2023 (oyh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Builders Group LLC v. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Builders Group, LLC
Represented By: Eric R Hail
Represented By: Edwin Andrew Huffman
Represented By: Megan Crosby McKennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Builders Group LLC
Represented By: Eric R Hail
Represented By: Edwin Andrew Huffman
Represented By: Megan Crosby McKennon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Hopkins
Represented By: Sara Schretenthaler Staha
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Represented By: Weston J Mumme
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skilld Labs
Represented By: Greg Patrick McAllister
Represented By: Sara Schretenthaler Staha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?