Anthony v. TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: James Deduan Anthony
Respondent: TDCJ-CID and Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 3:2023cv02868
Filed: December 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Deduan Anthony. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (agc)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:. NEF of Doc 4, 2254 form and IFP form Wed Jan 3 08:30:35 CST 2024 (crt)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC Order and Notice of Deficiency: Petitioner James Deduan Anthony must address the following deficiency: Petitioner filed a document [doc. 3] that appears to challenge his state convictions under 28 U.S.C. 2254, but he did not file his petition for a writ of habeas corpus on the court-approved form. See N.D. TEX. L.R. 5.4 and MISC. ORD. 13 (requiring inmates to file petitions for writ of habeas corpus on the court-approved form). Nor did he pay the required $5.00 filing fee or file a proper request to proceed in forma pauperis along with a certified statement of the balance in his inmate trust account. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(2); N.D. TEX. MISC. ORD. 14 (requiring inmates to file motions to proceed in forma pauperis on the court-approved form). Therefore by January 30, 2024, Petitioner is ORDERED to (1) complete and file a petition on the form used in this Court for actions filed under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and (2) pay the $5.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis with the required certificate of inmate trust account. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER WILL RESULT IN THE DISMISSAL OF THIS ACTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide to Petitioner, with service of this Order, a form petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 and a prisoner motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 1/2/2024) (chmb)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Thu Dec 28 16:02:32 CST 2023 (crt)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by James Deduan Anthony. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony v. TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Deduan Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?