Sharlene v. USPS
Plaintiff: Jackson and Jackson Sharlene
Defendant: USPS
Case Number: 3:2024cv00330
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Lindsay
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE Regarding Service filed by Jackson Sharlene. (agc)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to USPS. (axm)
March 12, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8, 9. Tue Mar 12 10:36:23 CDT 2024 (crt)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to serve her Complaint on Defendant and file proof of service with the Court by 5/12/2024. If Plaintiff fails to do so, the Court may recommend that her Complaint against Defendant be dismissed without prejudice. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/11/2024) (axm)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 3/11/2024) (axm)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jackson Sharlene. (cfk)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Court Request for Recusal: Magistrate Judge David L. Horan recused pursuant to Special Order 3-346. Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford assigned for matters that may be referred in this case. (agc)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Tue Feb 13 10:11:07 CST 2024 (crt)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jackson Sharlene. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (cfk)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 COMPLAINT against USPS filed by Jackson Sharlene. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number 300010252) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (cfk)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (cfk)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharlene v. USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Sharlene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?