Hodge v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Hodge
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv01476
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 18 Case electronically transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-01475. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
June 14, 2024 Filing 17 Certified copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the JPML transferring this action to the USDC Northern District of Texas for inclusion in MDL 3114. (jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 5/23/24. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline . IT IS ORDERED that AT&T Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC's respective deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint are extended until 30 days after the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) enters an order on the motion to consolidate filed by the plaintiff in Petroski v. AT&T, Inc., Case No. 3:24-cv-00757, and the deadline for the parties to confer under Local Rule 23.1(C)(2) is 21 days after the order on the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 5/16/2024. (jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 14, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Lisa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 8, 2024 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Collins, Lisa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Nicole Collins on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Collins, Lisa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting the #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David Michael Berger. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/23/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to David Michael Berger re #11 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Terri Lynn Hodge. AT&T, Inc. waiver mailed on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Tribble, James) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 18, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Terri Lynn Hodge. AT&T Mobility LLC waiver mailed on 4/10/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Tribble, James) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 12, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of David Michael Berger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13355653).. Attorney David Michael Berger added appearing on behalf of Terri Lynn Hodge. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting the #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Linda Pham Lam. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/11/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 11, 2024 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of David Michael Berger Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13355653).by Terri Lynn Hodge. (Tribble, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 11, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Linda Pham Lam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13353351). Attorney Linda Pham Lam added appearing on behalf of Terri Lynn Hodge. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (cpp) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 10, 2024 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Linda Pham Lam Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13353351).by Terri Lynn Hodge. (Tribble, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 9, 2024 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Terri Lynn Hodge. (Tribble, James) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Linda Pham Lam. Clerk to follow-up by 4/18/2024. (cpp) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to David Michael Berger. Clerk to follow-up by 4/18/2024. (cpp) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 8, 2024 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(gww) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13343748) filed by Terri Lynn Hodge. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gww) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Lynn Hodge
Represented By: James Cameron Tribble
Represented By: Linda Pham Lam
Represented By: Roy E Barnes
Represented By: David Michael Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?