Hasson et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hasson and Chad Graddy
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv01478
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2024 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-01580. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
June 14, 2024 Filing 13 Certified copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) from the JPML transferring this action to the USDC Northern District of Texas for inclusion in MDL 3114. (jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion to Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline. IT IS ORDERED that AT&T Inc. and AT&T Mobility LLC's respective deadlines to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint are extended until 30 days after the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML) enters an order on the motion to consolidate filed by the plaintiff in Petroski v. AT&T, Inc., Case No. 3:24-cv-00757, and the deadline for the parties to confer under Local Rule 23.1(C)(2) is 21 days after the order on the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 5/16/2024. (jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 14, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Responsive Pleading Deadline by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Lisa) Modified on 5/16/2024 (jbu). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER:GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORETHE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 5/14/24. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 8, 2024 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc.. (Collins, Lisa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
May 8, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Nicole Collins on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Collins, Lisa) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting the 6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gary F. Lynch. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/25/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 25, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary F. Lynch Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13388157). Attorney Gary F. Lynch added appearing on behalf of Chad Graddy, Kenneth Hasson. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 23, 2024 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Jennifer French re #5 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the 4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer Michele French. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 4/22/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jbu) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 19, 2024 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Jennifer Michele French Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13373251).. Attorney Jennifer M. French added appearing on behalf of Kenneth Hasson. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (djs) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 16, 2024 Filing 3 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Jennifer M. French. Clerk to follow-up by 4/26/2024. (cpp) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bmr) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]
April 15, 2024 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kenneth Hasson, Chad Graddy. (Filing fee $405, receipt number CGANDC-13363712) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bmr) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 6/14/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hasson et al v. AT&T Mobility LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hasson
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Jennifer M. French
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Graddy
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: Gary F Lynch
Represented By: Jennifer M. French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Represented By: Lisa Nicole Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?