Williams v. Doe
Plaintiff: Matthew Williams
Defendant: Doe
Case Number: 3:2024cv02026
Filed: August 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ada Brown
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Other: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that: 1. The plaintiff's federal claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2)(B). 2. The plaintiff's state-law claims are dismissed without prejudice to his ability to pursue them in state court. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/2/2024) (twd)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ACCEPTING #13 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 10/2/2024) (twd)
October 2, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:14,15. Wed Oct 2 16:34:58 CDT 2024 (crt)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The Court should dismiss his federal claims with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1915(A) and 1915(e)(2)(B) and should dismiss his state-law claims without prejudice to his ability to pursue them in state court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/16/2024) (cfk)
September 16, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Mon Sep 16 15:10:18 CDT 2024 (crt)
August 13, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:12. and mailed to the Inmate Trust Fund Department Tue Aug 13 08:30:12 CDT 2024 (crt)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk to mail this order to the attention of the Inmate Trust Fund Department at the facility where the inmate resides. If the inmate is housed in a Residential Reentry Center - RRC, Clerk to mail to mail this order to the Director of Corrections at the address of the petitioner. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 8/12/2024) (kcr)
August 9, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:10,11. Fri Aug 9 10:53:54 CDT 2024 (crt)
August 8, 2024 Filing 11 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (agc)
August 8, 2024 Filing 10 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford. (agc)
August 8, 2024 Filing 9 Case electronically transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00077. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
July 29, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 MOTION to Extend Time. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (bad image file) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to #3 and hereto for service to the parties. (kbc) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to transfer plaintiff's entire case file to the Northern District of Texas after delay of a reasonable time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/9/2024. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Matthew Williams. (ldb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Doe, filed by Matthew Williams. (ldb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 motion for extension of time; plaintiff must submit either the $405 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/31/2024. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
May 29, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION to Extend Time by Matthew Williams. (csf) Additional attachment added on 7/29/2024: #1 Main Document - Correct. (kbc) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
May 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff to either submit the $405 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order; and directing the Clerk to send plaintiff an in forma pauperis motion with the filing fee calculation sheet and a blank 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 5/8/2024. (jak) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe filed by Matthew Williams. (llg) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 8/9/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?