Wheeler v. Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Wheeler
Defendant: William Mynatt, Jr and Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv02058
Filed: August 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2024 Filing 12 REPLY filed by Daniel Wheeler re: #8 Motion to Remand/Motion to Strike (Wheeler, Daniel) Modified linkage on 9/5/2024 (knb).
August 30, 2024 Filing 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc, William Mynatt, Jr re #10 Response/Objection (Lopez, Vivian)
August 30, 2024 Filing 10 RESPONSE filed by Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc, William Mynatt, Jr re: #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court MOTION to Strike, #9 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez, Vivian)
August 29, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court Combined with Motion to Strike Defendant Motion to Dismiss filed by Daniel Wheeler. (cfk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2024: #1 Additional Page(s)) (cfk).
August 27, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Combined with MOTION to Strike #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Daniel Wheeler (Wheeler, Daniel) Modified event text on 8/28/2024 (kcr).
August 16, 2024 Filing 7 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc, William Mynatt, Jr re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Lopez, Vivian)
August 16, 2024 Filing 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc, William Mynatt, Jr (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lopez, Vivian)
August 13, 2024 Filing 5 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (axm)
August 13, 2024 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
August 13, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vivian Nahir Lopez on behalf of Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc, William Mynatt, Jr.. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lopez, Vivian)
August 13, 2024 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc, William Mynatt, Jr.. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lopez, Vivian)
August 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by William Mynatt, Jr, Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14836186) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Sheet, #3 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Cronenwett, Mark) (Attachments 2 & 3 replaced on 8/13/2024 to flatten pdf) (axm).
August 13, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4,5. Tue Aug 13 16:03:02 CDT 2024 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheeler v. Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Mynatt, Jr
Represented By: Vivian Nahir Lopez
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovenmuehle Mortgage Inc
Represented By: Vivian Nahir Lopez
Represented By: Mark D Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?