Ellis v. Selene Finance LP et al
Plaintiff: Perry Ellis
Defendant: Barings LLC, Barings Finance LLC, Selene Finance LP, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Barings Capital Investments Corp and Barings BDC Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv02169
Filed: August 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Referring Judge: Rebecca Rutherford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Filing 24 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Perry Ellis re: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Ellis, Perry)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #22 Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' Reply is now due on or before October 29, 2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 10/15/2024) (chmb)
October 14, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Selene Finance LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fontein, Addison)
October 7, 2024 Filing 21 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Perry Ellis. (Ellis, Perry)
October 7, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY filed by Perry Ellis re: #17 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel (Ellis, Perry)
October 1, 2024 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Perry Ellis re: #14 Response/Objection, #5 MOTION to Remand (Ellis, Perry) Modified linkage on 10/2/2024 (knb).
October 1, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY filed by Perry Ellis re: #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ellis, Perry)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/27/2024) (ndt)
September 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Leave to Stay. Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Dismiss is due on or before 10/2/2024, and Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response is due 14 days after any response is filed. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/18/2024) (cfk)
September 18, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Perry Ellis (Attachments: #1 Affidavit(s) Affidavit and printout of attorney referral service) (Ellis, Perry)
September 18, 2024 Filing 14 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Selene Finance LP re: #5 MOTION to Remand (Fontein, Addison)
September 17, 2024 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Perry Ellis re #12 MOTION to Stay MOTION FOR LEAVE TO STAY ALL 12(B)(6) MOTIONS (Ellis, Perry)
September 17, 2024 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay MOTION FOR LEAVE TO STAY ALL 12(B)(6) MOTIONS filed by Perry Ellis (Ellis, Perry)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: In view of the pending Motion to Remand and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss, the Court finds good cause to DEFER the entry of a scheduling order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/16/2024) (chmb)
September 11, 2024 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Selene Finance LP re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Fontein, Addison)
September 11, 2024 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Selene Finance LP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fontein, Addison)
August 29, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perry Ellis. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ellis, Perry)
August 29, 2024 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Selene Finance LP. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Fontein, Addison)
August 29, 2024 Filing 6 Certificate of Conference re: #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Perry Ellis (Ellis, Perry) Modified text and linkage on 8/30/2024 (ykp).
August 28, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand filed by Perry Ellis. (kcr)
August 28, 2024 Filing 4 THIRD AMENDED PETITION & APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, & PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Selene Finance LP filed by Perry Ellis. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kcr)
August 26, 2024 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2, 3. Mon Aug 26 10:22:43 CDT 2024 (crt)
August 23, 2024 Filing 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (kcr)
August 23, 2024 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
August 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Barings BDC, Inc., Barings Capital Investments Corp., Selene Finance LP, Barings LLC, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance, Barings Finance LLC. (Filing fee $405; receipt number BTXNDC-14865825) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Exhibit Index), #2 Exhibit(s) B (State Court Docket Sheet), #3 Exhibit(s) C (State Court Documents), #4 Exhibit(s) D (List of Attorneys), #5 Cover Sheet E (Civil Cover Sheet), #6 Cover Sheet Supplement F (Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)) (Fontein, Addison) (Attachment 5 and 6 flattened on 8/26/2024) (kcr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Selene Finance LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barings LLC
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barings Finance LLC
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance LP
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barings Capital Investments Corp
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barings BDC Inc
Represented By: Addison Fontein
Represented By: Justin R Opitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?