Grantham v. Ogle et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Grantham
Defendant: Cory William Ogle and Riverside Transportation Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv02426
Filed: September 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STANDING ORDER ON REQUESTS FOR HEARINGS AND ORAL ARGUMENTS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STANDING ORDER ON FILING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND NON-DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. Pretrial Order due by 9/15/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 9/15/2025. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2025 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David L. Horan. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2025. Discovery due by 5/13/2025. Joinder of Parties due by 2/15/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/30/2025. Motions due by 1/13/2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: By 11/29/2024, Defendants must comply with Local Civil Rule 81.1(a) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) so that the Court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: More than twenty-one days have passed but Plaintiff Catherine Grantham did not file a Certificate of Interested Persons. By 11/29/2024, Plaintiff must comply with Local Civil Rule 81.2 so that the Court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING FILING OF STATE COURT NOTICE: The Court ORDERS the removing defendant to if it has not already done so file, by no later than 7 days after the date of this order, a copy of the notice filed with the state court in compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court hereby VACATES the 10/6/2025 trial setting and all unexpired deadlines set by the Court's 11/12/2024 #9 Scheduling Order. And the Court will reset trial and all related deadlines by a separate order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 11/19/2024) (agc)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to a Magistrate Judge Order #10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Brantley Starr no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/14/2024) (ndt) . (Cox, Clinton)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by all parties and Order Reassigning Case. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David L. Horan for all further proceedings. Judge Brantley Starr no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/14/2024) (ndt)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *** VACATED PER #12 ORDER. SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week docket beginning on 10/6/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Brantley Starr. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/26/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 12/3/2024. Discovery due by 5/12/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2025 01:30 PM before Judge Brantley Starr. Joinder of Parties due by 12/3/2024. Motions due by 6/9/2025. Pretrial Order due by 9/22/2025. Pretrial Materials due by 9/22/2025. Status Report due by 6/2/2025. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 11/12/2024) (kcr) Modified text on 11/19/2024 (agc).
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of parties' consent(s) to proceed before the magistrate judge filed by Catherine Grantham, Cory William Ogle, Riverside Transportation Inc. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's consent form) (mms)
November 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Proposal by Catherine Grantham. (Davis, Stafford)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting Plaintiff Catherine Grantham's #5 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 10/30/2024) (chmb)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Catherine Grantham (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Davis, Stafford)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND PROPOSAL FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING AND DISCOVERY ORDER: Proposal due by 11/11/2024. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/27/2024) (ndt)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff Catherine Grantham to appoint local counsel, in accordance with Local Rule 83.10, or to file a motion to proceed without local counsel, by October 28, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Brantley Starr on 9/27/2024) (chmb)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cory William Ogle, Riverside Transportation Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). See document #1 for image. (kcr)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Cory William Ogle. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14946099) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration(s) Certificate of Interested Persons / Disclosure Statement, #7 Declaration(s) Index of Pleadings, #8 Additional Page(s) Index of Pleadings - Doc 1, #9 Additional Page(s) Index of Pleadings - Doc 2, #10 Additional Page(s) Index of Pleadings - Doc 3, #11 Additional Page(s) Index of Pleadings - Doc 4) (Cox, Clinton) (Attachment 4 flattened on 9/26/2024) (kcr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grantham v. Ogle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory William Ogle
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Lopez
Represented By: Clinton V Cox, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Transportation Inc
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Lopez
Represented By: Clinton V Cox, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Grantham
Represented By: Stafford Grigsby Helm Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?