Chatmon v. Facebook Meta et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Chatmon and Timothy C Chatmon
Defendant: Shopify, GoDaddy and Facebook Meta
Case Number: 3:2024cv03244
Filed: December 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Karen Gren Scholer
Referring Judge: Renee Harris Toliver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: terminating as moot #4 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and #5 motion to appoint counsel in light of the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge that this case be dismissed. In the event the District Judge declines to accept the recommendation of the Magistrate Judge to dismiss this action, Plaintiff may re-urge the motions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/28/2025) (chmb)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Plaintiff's complaint should be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as venue is improperly laid in this Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 1/24/2025) (agc)
January 8, 2025 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Econ, Facebook Meta, GoDaddy, Shopify filed by Timothy Chatmon. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (kaf)
January 7, 2025 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Timothy Chatmon. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (kaf)
December 27, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Timothy Chatmon. (knb)
December 27, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Timothy Chatmon. (knb)
December 27, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Econ, Facebook Meta, GoDaddy, Shopify filed by Timothy Chatmon. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (knb)
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (knb)
December 27, 2024 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Toliver (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatmon v. Facebook Meta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shopify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Meta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Chatmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy C Chatmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?