Delacruz v. Sunbeam Products Inc et al
Plaintiff: Laura Lynn Delacruz
Defendant: Newell Brands Inc and Sunbeam Products Inc
Case Number: 3:2024cv03245
Filed: December 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER:Before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel (the "Motion") (Doc. No. 25). Having carefully considered the same, the Court GRANTS the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 2/5/2025) (chmb)
February 4, 2025 Filing 25 MOTION Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Doan, Darby)
January 29, 2025 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunbeam Products Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Doan, Darby)
January 29, 2025 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Newell Brands Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Doan, Darby)
January 29, 2025 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald Rae Ross on behalf of Sunbeam Products Inc, Newell Brands Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Ross, Donald)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where the attorney of record for a party does not reside or maintain their principal office in this district. Defendants shall each file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) by February 11, 2025. Further, as set forth in the undersigned's Judge Specific Requirements, local counsel must sign all documents filed with this Court. This Court's Judge Specific Requirements can be found at https://www.txnd.uscourts.gov/judge/district-judge-ed-kinkeade. Any filings after February 11, 2025, that do not also include local counsel's signature will be immediately UNFILED regardless of any related deadline. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/28/2025) (chmb)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff filed this case in federal court invoking this Court's diversity jurisdiction. Doc. No. 1 at 5. In all diversity matters, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) requires an additional disclosure statement. Each party's disclosure statement must "name--and identify the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party[.]" Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) (emphasis added). Defendants timely their respective Certificate of Interested Parties (Doc. Nos. 16 & 18) but neither filing includes the required citizenship disclosure. Accordingly, Defendants shall each file an amended certificate of interested parties by January 31, 2025 that includes a statement of their citizenship as required. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/28/2025) (chmb)
January 27, 2025 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunbeam Products Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Doan, Darby)
January 27, 2025 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Sunbeam Products Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Darby Vincent Doan added to party Sunbeam Products Inc(pty:dft) (Doan, Darby)
January 27, 2025 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Newell Brands Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Doan, Darby)
January 27, 2025 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Newell Brands Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Darby Vincent Doan added to party Newell Brands Inc(pty:dft) (Doan, Darby)
January 10, 2025 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Newell Brands Inc; served on 1/6/2025. (Kress, Adam)
January 10, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Sunbeam Products Inc; served on 1/6/2025. (Kress, Adam)
January 7, 2025 Filing 12 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Laura Lynn Delacruz. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kress, Adam)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Notice of Interested Parties (Doc. No. 10). Plaintiff failed to make the citizenship disclosure statement required by Rule 7.1(a)(2) in all diversity matters, which the Court expressly highlighted in its prior order. Doc. No. 7.Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file an amended certificate of interested parties which also includes the disclosure of her (state) citizenship pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2) by January 7, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/6/2025) (chmb)
January 3, 2025 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Laura Lynn Delacruz. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Kress, Adam)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Adam Kress. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/3/2025) (chmb)
January 3, 2025 Filing 8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15162540) filed by Laura Lynn Delacruz (Kress, Adam)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff filed her complaint (Doc. No. 1) on December 27, 2024. However, Plaintiff failed to also file her certificate of interested persons as required by this Court's local civil rule. L. Civ. R. 3.1; see also Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file the required document by January 6, 2025.Because Plaintiff invokes the Court's subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), Rule 7.1(a)(2) requires an additional disclosure statement. Each party's disclosure statement must "name--and identify the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party[.]" Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) (emphasis added). Plaintiff shall ensure that her certificate of interested persons includes the required disclosure statemnent of her State citizenship. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/2/2025) (chmb)
December 27, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Newell Brands Inc, Sunbeam Products Inc. (agc)
December 27, 2024 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (agc)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: This Order governs requests to file materials in this case under seal. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/27/2024) (chmb)
December 27, 2024 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Laura Lynn Delacruz. (Clark, Collen) (Main Document 3 replaced to flatten PDF on 12/27/2024) (agc).
December 27, 2024 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Laura Lynn Delacruz. (Clark, Collen) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten PDF on 12/27/2024) (agc).
December 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Laura Lynn Delacruz. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15151985) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet) (Clark, Collen) (Attachment 3 replaced to flatten PDF on 12/27/2024) (agc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delacruz v. Sunbeam Products Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newell Brands Inc
Represented By: Donald Rae Ross
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbeam Products Inc
Represented By: Donald Rae Ross
Represented By: Darby Vincent Doan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lynn Delacruz
Represented By: Collen A Clark
Represented By: Adam John Kress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?