Thomas v. Well Fargo Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sue Thomas
Defendant: Kirk Swartz, Well Fargo Bank NA and 192nd District Court
Case Number: 3:2025cv00081
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David C Godbey
Referring Judge: Brian McKay
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Filing 8 JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED that this civil action is DISMISSED without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/7/2025) (twd)
March 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ACCEPTING #6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: By separate judgment, the Court will DISMISS this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Court DENIES the plaintiff's request for injunctive relief. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/7/2025) (twd)
March 7, 2025 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7,8. Fri Mar 7 15:44:45 CST 2025 (crt)
January 14, 2025 Filing 6 Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge re: #3 Complaint filed by Carolyn Sue Thomas. The Court should DISMISS this action without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and DENY the request for injunctive relief. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 1/14/2025) (mcrd)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 1/14/2025) (mcrd)
January 14, 2025 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Tue Jan 14 16:41:58 CST 2025 (crt)
January 13, 2025 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carolyn Sue Thomas (ykp)
January 13, 2025 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against 192nd District Court, Kirk Swartz, Well Fargo Bank NA filed by Carolyn Sue Thomas. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (ykp)
January 13, 2025 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (ykp)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge McKay (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
January 13, 2025 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Mon Jan 13 11:12:11 CST 2025 (crt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Well Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Sue Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Swartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Well Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 192nd District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?