Colbert v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Petitioner: Christopher Brian Colbert
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Case Number: 3:2025cv00649
Filed: March 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David L Horan
Referring Judge: Ed Kinkeade
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet/Habeas Corpus: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2025 Filing 8 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (knb)
March 18, 2025 Filing 7 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (knb)
March 18, 2025 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Southern; Case Number 4:25-cv-00042. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed.
March 18, 2025 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:7, 8. NEF of #6 Tue Mar 18 15:50:01 CDT 2025 (crt)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to US District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Dallas Division (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified. (jld4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/18/2025.]
February 19, 2025 Filing 4 Letter from Christopher Brian Colbert, filed. (mew4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/18/2025.]
January 6, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (csr4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/18/2025.]
January 6, 2025 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (csr4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/18/2025.]
January 6, 2025 Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Christina A. Bryan randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (csr4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/18/2025.]
January 3, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Christopher Brian Colbert. (csr4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 3/18/2025.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colbert v. Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Brian Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bobby Lumpkin
Represented By: Edward L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?