Brown et al v. Texas A&M University School of Law et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Kristin R. Brown, Norma A. Bazan, Charles E. Ames, Maria Jackson Branch, Monty J. Buhrow, Amanda M. Coffey, Cherry L. Davis, Payam Ghassemi Dell, Bryan Eggleston, Janice Eggleston, Jeff Fletcher, Amy Theresa Ford, Julie Glover, Terance Grisso, Patricia Donovan Henderson, Deborah Johnson, R. Renee Jolley, Jared Julian, Myron Eugene Kimball, Jr., Mark Lane, Jennifer Browning Ledbetter, Adam Luck, Riley C. Massey, Venisa McLaughlin, Adam Miller, Roxie Roll, Elliott Smith, Kathleen Hennessey Smith, Cynthia Cooper Spigel, Suzanne Stevens, Kevin Ray Walden and Kathryn Freed-Collier
Defendant: Texas A&M University School of Law, Andrew P. Morriss, Texas Wesleyan University and Frederick G. Slabach
Case Number: 4:2015cv00613
Filed: August 11, 2015
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Fort Worth Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2015 37 Featured Case ORDER: The court ORDERS that if plaintiffs wish to pursue further their motion for leave to file an amended complaint, they shall file by 2:00p.m. on January 4, 2016, a version of their proposed amended pleading with all additions to and deletions from the First Amended Complaint-Class Action identified in such a way that the court can readily see the differences between the proposed pleading and the pleading it would replace. The court further ORDERS that by 2:00p.m. on January 11, 2016, defendants file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, specifying in their response, to the extent appropriate, particular language in the proposed amended pleading to which they object, providing in each instance the legal and factual basis for each objection, with citation in each instance to applicable legal authority. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 12/30/2015) (trs)
December 29, 2015 36 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Kristin R. Brown et al (trs)
December 29, 2015 35 OBJECTION AND RESPONSE filed by Kristin R. Brown et al re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
December 29, 2015 34 OBJECTION AND RESPONSE filed by Kristin R. Brown et al re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
December 18, 2015 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Texas A&M University System. Waiver sent on 11/24/2015. (trs)
December 18, 2015 32 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Texas A&M University. Waiver sent on 11/24/2015. (trs)
December 7, 2015 31 Brief in Support filed by Andrew P. Morriss, Texas A&M University, Texas A&M University School of Law, Texas A&M University System re 30 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
December 7, 2015 30 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew P. Morriss, Texas A&M University, Texas A&M University School of Law, Texas A&M University System (trs)
December 7, 2015 29 Brief in Support filed by Frederick G. Slabach, Texas Wesleyan University re 28 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
December 7, 2015 28 MOTION to Dismiss "First Amended Complaint - Class Action" filed by Frederick G. Slabach, Texas Wesleyan University (trs)
November 18, 2015 27 Summons Issued as to Phil Adams, Robert L. Albritton, Anthony G. Buzbee, Morris E. Foster, R. Bowen Loftin, Bill Mahomes, Elaine Mendoza, Judy Morgan, Alvaro Gabriel Pereira, Charles W. Schwartz, John Sharp, Arik Short, Texas A&M University, Texas A&M University System, Cliff Thomas, Karan Watson, Michael K. Young. (trs)
November 18, 2015 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 25 Unopposed Motion (1) For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' "First Amended Complaint - Class Action" and (2) To Stay Plaintiffs' "Motion to Certify Class Action" and Brief in Support. The court further orders that defendants have until December 7, 2015 to file a response to the plaintiffs' amended petition and until 21 days after any order denying any motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to file a response to the plaintiffs' motion for class certification. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/18/2015) (tln)
November 17, 2015 25 Original Defendants' Unopposed Motion (1) For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' "First Amended Complaint - Class Action" and (2) To Stay Plaintiffs' "Motion to Certify Class Action" and Brief in Support filed by Andrew P. Morriss, Frederick G. Slabach, Texas A&M University School of Law, Texas Wesleyan University (trs)
November 10, 2015 24 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss: On November 9, 2015, plaintiffs Kristin Brown, et al., filed an amended complaint, which purports to address at least some of the issues raised in the motions to dismiss. So that there will be no confusion, i.e., no need for sur-replies to replies that will raise new grounds for dismissal, the court is ordering that the motions to dismiss, which address the original complaint, be denied as moot. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/10/2015) (trs)
November 9, 2015 23 Plaintiffs' Objection and Response to Defendants Texas Wesleyan University and Frederick Slabach's Motion to Dismiss "Original Complaint - Class Action" filed by Kristin R. Brown et al re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
November 9, 2015 22 Plaintiffs' Objection and Response to A&M Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Kristin R. Brown et al re: 13 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
November 9, 2015 21 Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class Action filed by Kristin R. Brown et al re 20 MOTION to Certify Class Action (trs)
November 9, 2015 20 MOTION to Certify Class Action filed by Kristin R. Brown et al (trs)
November 9, 2015 19 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against Andrew P. Morriss, Frederick G. Slabach, Texas A&M University School of Law, Texas Wesleyan University filed by Kristin R. Brown et al. If additional patent or trademark numbers are included, the clerk will prepare the appropriate Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (trs)
October 27, 2015 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings. The court ORDERS that plaintiffs' motion for extension of time be, and is hereby, granted, and that plaintiffs be, and are hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00p.m. on November 9, 2015, in which to file their responses to the pending motions to dismiss and to file their motion to certify class. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/27/2015) (trs)
October 27, 2015 17 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading re 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kristin R. Brown, et al. (trs)
October 15, 2015 16 Brief in Support (revised) filed by Andrew P. Morriss, Texas A&M University School of Law re 13 MOTION to Dismiss (trs)
October 13, 2015 15 Order Unfiling 14 Brief in Support of Motion filed by Texas A&M University School of Law, Andrew P. Morriss due to the following deficiency: Each evidentiary item, including any exhbits, filed in connection with any pleading or other paper shall be clearly marked by the exhibit number or letter, or other designation if any, assigned to the item. All such items shall be filed as attachments, or in a separate volume, bearing consecutive page numbers and appropriate index tabs so that the court can readily locate each item... (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/13/2015) (trs)
October 13, 2015 14 ***UNFILED per 15 Order***Brief in Support filed by Andrew P. Morriss, Texas A&M University School of Law re 13 MOTION to Dismiss (trs) Modified on 10/14/2015 (trs).
October 13, 2015 13 A&M Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew P. Morriss, Texas A&M University School of Law (trs)
October 9, 2015 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Frederick G. Slabach, Texas Wesleyan University. (ewd)
October 9, 2015 11 Brief in Support filed by Frederick G. Slabach, Texas Wesleyan University re 10 MOTION to Dismiss (ewd)
October 9, 2015 10 MOTION to Dismiss Original Complaint - Class Action filed by Frederick G. Slabach, Texas Wesleyan University (ewd)
September 15, 2015 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Texas A&M University School of Law. Waiver sent on 9/11/2015. (trs)
September 15, 2015 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Andrew P. Morriss. Waiver sent on 9/11/2015. (trs)
September 15, 2015 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Frederick G. Slabach. Waiver sent on 9/1/2015; Texas Wesleyan University. Waiver sent on 9/1/2015. (trs)
August 11, 2015 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trs)
August 11, 2015 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (trs) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/12/2015) (trs).
August 11, 2015 4 Featured Case Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 8/11/2015) (trs)
August 11, 2015 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (trs)
August 11, 2015 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charles E. Ames, Norma A. Bazan, Kristin R. Brown, Jennifer Browning Ledbetter, Monty J. Buhrow, Amanda M. Coffey, Cynthia Cooper Spigel, Cherry L. Davis, Payam Ghassemi Dell, Patricia Donovan Henderson, Bryan Eggleston, Janice Eggleston, Jeff Fletcher, Amy Theresa Ford, Kathryn Freed-Collier, Julie Glover, Terance Grisso, Kathleen Hennessey Smith, Maria Jackson Branch, Deborah Johnson, R. Renee Jolley, Jared Julian, Myron Eugene Kimball, Jr, Mark Lane, Adam Luck, Riley C. Massey, Venisa McLaughlin, Adam Miller, Roxie Roll, Elliott Smith, Suzanne Stevens, Kevin Ray Walden. (Norred, Warren)
August 11, 2015 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Andrew P. Morriss, Frederick G. Slabach, Texas A&M University School of Law, Texas Wesleyan University filed by R. Renee Jolley, Kathryn Freed-Collier, Jeff Fletcher, Maria Jackson Branch, Bryan Eggleston, Kristin R. Brown, Kathleen Hennessey Smith, Julie Glover, Terance Grisso, Cynthia Cooper Spigel, Kevin Ray Walden, Suzanne Stevens, Adam Miller, Deborah Johnson, Jared Julian, Amanda M. Coffey, Elliott Smith, Cherry L. Davis, Amy Theresa Ford, Patricia Donovan Henderson, Mark Lane, Norma A. Bazan, Monty J. Buhrow, Roxie Roll, Jennifer Browning Ledbetter, Payam Ghassemi Dell, Venisa McLaughlin, Myron Eugene Kimball, Jr, Riley C. Massey, Janice Eggleston, Adam Luck, Charles E. Ames. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-6987669) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit(s) Appendix) (Norred, Warren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Texas A&M University School of Law et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin R. Brown
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma A. Bazan
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles E. Ames
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Jackson Branch
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monty J. Buhrow
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda M. Coffey
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry L. Davis
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payam Ghassemi Dell
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Eggleston
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Eggleston
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Fletcher
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Theresa Ford
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Glover
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terance Grisso
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Donovan Henderson
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Johnson
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Renee Jolley
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Julian
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myron Eugene Kimball, Jr.
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lane
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Browning Ledbetter
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Luck
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley C. Massey
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venisa McLaughlin
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Miller
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxie Roll
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Smith
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Hennessey Smith
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Cooper Spigel
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Stevens
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Ray Walden
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Freed-Collier
Represented By: Warren V Norred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas A&M University School of Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew P. Morriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Wesleyan University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick G. Slabach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?