University Baptist Church v. Lexington Ins Co

Plaintiff: University Baptist Church
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company, Kevin Forman and York Risk Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2017cv00962
Filed: December 4, 2017
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Office: Fort Worth Office
County: Tarrant
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER: The court ORDERS that the 43 motion of Lexington be, and is hereby, granted, and that Church's claims be, and are hereby, dismissed. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/11/2018) (bdb)
May 23, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court Amended Memorandum Opinion and Order..the motion of York granted, pltf's claims against York dismissed. The only deft in this action is Lexington Insurance Company. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/23/2018) (wrb)
May 16, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court Memorandum Opinion and Order...Motion of York granted; pltfs claims against York dismissed. From this point forward, the style shall read "University Baptist Church of Fort Worth, Plaintiff vs. Lexington Insurance Company, Defendant". Court directs entry of final judgment as to the dismissal of Plaintiff's claims against York. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 5/16/2018) (wrb)
January 25, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand filed by University Baptist Church: The court further ORDERS that from this point forward Lexington and York are the only defendants in this action and that the action shall be styled as "University Baptist Church v. Lexington Insurance Company and York Risk Services Inc." (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 1/25/2018) (bdb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: University Baptist Church v. Lexington Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Baptist Church
Represented By: Timothy M Hoch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter W Cardwell, IV
Represented By: Brett A Wallingford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Forman
Represented By: Robert M Rosen
Represented By: Ryan Davis Starbird
Represented By: David A Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York Risk Services Inc
Represented By: Robert M Rosen
Represented By: Ryan Davis Starbird
Represented By: David A Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?