September 6, 2018 |
Filing 6
ORDER granting #5 Appellant William Paul Burch's Motion to File the Designation of Record After the Deadline (ECF No. #5 ). (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/6/2018) (skg)
|
September 4, 2018 |
Filing 5
MOTION to File the Designation of Record filed by William Paul Burch. (bdb)
|
August 10, 2018 |
Filing 4
Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for < number 12-46959-mxm7. Pursuant to < 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Mini Record) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing 3
Notice of transmission of bankruptcy record on appeal for < number 18-611. Pursuant to < 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8018 for information on briefing times. (Attachments: #1 Service list, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Calfee - TXNB, Jennifer)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing 2
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
|
July 30, 2018 |
New Case Notes: A filing fee is due to the bankruptcy court. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge O Connor. (wrb)
|
July 27, 2018 |
Filing 1
Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in < number 12-46959-mxm7 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:18-cv-611. (The filing fee is due to the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to < 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also < 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: <. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Docket Sheet) (Calfee - TXNB, Jennifer)
|