Smith v. JPS Mental & Health Hospital

Plaintiff: Shaynise Lanee Smith
Defendant: JPS Mental & Health Hospital
Case Number: 4:2018cv00762
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9. , and two blank summons forms and two USM 285 Forms have been mailed to Plaintiff for completition. Thu Sep 20 15:47:08 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 20, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to deliver summons forms with a copy of this order to Plaintiff for completion and return to the Clerk of Court for issuance. Once Plaintiff completes the summons forms and they are returned to the Clerk of Court, the Clerk shall issue the summons as completed, and deliver them to the U.S. Marshals to effectuate service. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/20/2018) (skg)
September 18, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8. Tue Sep 18 16:05:21 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 18, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS: It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [docket no. #4 ] is GRANTED, such that plaintiff Shaynise Lanee Smith is authorized to proceed with the commencement of this civil suit without prepayment of fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/18/2018) (bdb)
September 17, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6,7. Mon Sep 17 09:56:10 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 14, 2018 7 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bcr)
September 14, 2018 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (bcr)
September 14, 2018 New case number 4:18-cv-762 Smith v. JPS Mental & Health Hospital has been opened following the order of transfer entered in case number 3:18-cv-2405. Future filings should be made in the FORT WORTH division and reflect the new case number as indicated. Clerk to complete new case processing and mail notice of this entry to any party who did not receive it electronically. (cea)
September 14, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Fri Sep 14 15:28:00 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 14, 2018 5 Featured Case Order transferring case to the Fort Worth Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rebecca Rutherford on 9/14/2018) (axm)
September 11, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1,2. Tue Sep 11 10:38:54 CDT 2018 (crt)
September 10, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. (sss)
September 10, 2018 3 COMPLAINT against JPS Mental & Health Hospital filed by Shaynise Lanee Smith. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sss)
September 10, 2018 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sss)
September 10, 2018 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Rutherford (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. JPS Mental & Health Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaynise Lanee Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPS Mental & Health Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?