Texas et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Nebraska, Wisconsin, Kansas, Texas, Louisiana and Indiana
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service, David J Kautter and United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00779
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hacker, David)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 14, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/17/2018) (skg)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Accordingly, the Court DENIES #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order as moot. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/17/2018) (skg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America (US Attorney General); served on 9/27/2018. (Hacker, David) Modified party served on 10/15/2018 (bdb).
October 12, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Internal Revenue Service ; served on 9/27/2018. (Hacker, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David J Kautter ; served on 9/26/2018. (Hacker, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Injunction (Hacker, David)
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of David J Kautter, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Straus Harris, Julie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle Bennett - DOJ on behalf of David J Kautter, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America. (Filer will update contact info in ECF.) (Bennett - DOJ, Michelle)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by David J Kautter, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America re: #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Injunction (Bennett - DOJ, Michelle)
September 24, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to David J Kautter ; served on 9/21/2018; United States Internal Revenue Service ; served on 9/21/2018. (Hacker, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States of America ; served on 9/21/2018. (Hacker, David)
September 22, 2018 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for TRO Scheduling Order, Motion for TRO, Complaint served on US Attorney, U.S. Dep't of Justice on 9/22/2018. (Hacker, David)
September 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING DEADLINES on #7 Motion for TRO. If not done already, Plaintiffs are ORDERED to immediately serve Defendants with all documents filed in this case. Defendants are ORDERED to respond to the motion on or before Wednesday, September 26, 2018. Plaintiffs may reply on or before Friday, September 28, 2018.(Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 9/22/2018)(chmb)(alo)
September 21, 2018 Filing 11 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER: Case reassigned to Judge Reed C. O'Connor for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. All future filings in this cause shall carry the suffix letter "O" at the end of the case number rather than "Y." (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 9/21/2018) (bdb)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Appendix in Support filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Hacker, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Hacker, David)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hacker, David). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 9/21/2018 (twd).
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons issued as to David J Kautter, United States Internal Revenue Service, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (tln)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin. (Hacker, David)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin. (Hacker, David)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Nebraska, Texas, Wisconsin. (Hacker, David)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nebraska, Kansas, Indiana, Wisconsin, Texas, Louisiana. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9466110) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Case) (Hacker, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wisconsin
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana
Represented By: David Jonathan Hacker
Represented By: Randall Wilson Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Michelle Bennett - DOJ
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Kautter
Represented By: Michelle Bennett - DOJ
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle Bennett - DOJ
Represented By: Julie Straus Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?