Mitchell v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Patti Mitchell and Steve Mitchell
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC and Wells Fargo NA
Case Number: 4:2018cv00820
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: Texas Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2019. Motions due by 7/22/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/22/2019. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2019. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning November 18, 2019 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/5/2018) (skg)
November 2, 2018 6 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order filed by Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC. (Jacocks, Eric)
October 5, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 2, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/5/2018) (skg)
October 4, 2018 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
October 4, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC AND WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2001-A ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2001-A. (Jacocks, Eric)
October 4, 2018 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC AND WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2001-A ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2001-A. (Jacocks, Eric)
October 4, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tarrant, case number 348-302355-18 filed by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC AND WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR OPTION ONE MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2001-A ASSET-BACKED CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2001-A. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9495633) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C1, #4 Exhibit(s) C2, #5 Exhibit(s) C3, #6 Exhibit(s) C4, #7 Exhibit(s) C5, #8 Exhibit(s) C6, #9 Exhibit(s) C7, #10 Exhibit(s) C8, #11 Exhibit(s) C9, #12 Exhibit(s) C10, #13 Exhibit(s) C11, #14 Exhibit(s) D, #15 Exhibit(s) E, #16 Exhibit(s) F, #17 Cover Sheet) (Jacocks, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Brinkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: J Garth Fennegan
Represented By: Eric Alexander Jacocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo NA
Represented By: J Garth Fennegan
Represented By: Eric Alexander Jacocks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?