DeOtte et al v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Hotze Health & Wellness Center, Yvette DeOtte, John Kelley, Richard W. DeOtte and Alison Kelley
Defendant: R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, United States of America and Steven T. Mnuchin
Case Number: 4:2018cv00825
Filed: October 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Referring Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard W. DeOtte, Yvette DeOtte, Hotze Health & Wellness Center, Alison Kelley, John Kelley (Fillmore, H)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bcr)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge John McBryde recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Reed C. O'Connor for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 4:18-cv-00825-O. (bcr)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 10/10/2018) (edm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge John McBryde for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Terry R Means no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/10/2018) (edm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richard W. DeOtte, Yvette DeOtte, Hotze Health & Wellness Center, Alison Kelley, John Kelley. (Fillmore, Charles)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to R. Alexander Acosta, Alex M. Azar, Steven T. Mnuchin, United States of America, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (edm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Means. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
October 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alison Kelley, Richard W. DeOtte, John Kelley, Yvette DeOtte, Hotze Health & Wellness Center. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9499813) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Cover Sheet) (Mitchell, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeOtte et al v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hotze Health & Wellness Center
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette DeOtte
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kelley
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. DeOtte
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alison Kelley
Represented By: Jonathan F Mitchell
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Alexander Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven T. Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?