Brown v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Plaintiff: Larry A Brown
Defendant: New Home Solution and Investment, Cederic Lydelle Brown, American Dream and Educational Concepts, BBVA Compass Bank, Walter L Irvin and Ray McDonald
Case Number: 4:2018cv00852
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Terry R Means
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Case copied to 3:18cv2898-L. Transfer to Dallas Division complete; clerk to set Related Case hyperlink, clear unnecessary flags, etc. (ldm)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Transfer Case out of District/Division Case transferred to the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas because the parties are located in Dallas County, Texas. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/31/2018) (wrb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Larry A Brown. (bdb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BBVA Compass Bank, Cederic Lydelle Brown, Walter L Irvin, Ray McDonald filed by Larry A Brown pursuant to #6 Order. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bdb)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT....to clarify the jurisdictional question raised in this matter, Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide the addresses for each defendant named in the complaint by Nov. 23 2018. (Ordered by Senior Judge Terry R Means on 10/26/2018) (wrb)
October 18, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. cy to Brown Thu Oct 18 15:59:38 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Authorizing Plaintiff to Proceed In Forma Pauperis/ Order Returning Case to District Judge, Motions terminated: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Larry A Brown. Footnote: no summons shall issue unless authorized by a further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/18/2018) (wrb)
October 18, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. cy to Brown Thu Oct 18 10:31:36 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 17, 2018 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Cureton preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis (long form) filed by Larry A Brown (wrb)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT BASED UPON VIOLATIONS HOUSING DISCRIMINATION AND FRAUD WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Larry A Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. BBVA Compass Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Home Solution and Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cederic Lydelle Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Dream and Educational Concepts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter L Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?