Ferrand v. Ben E. Keith Company
Plaintiff: Lisa R Ferrand
Defendant: Ben E. Keith Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00887
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Mail returned as undeliverable. The current document has not been re-mailed. (wxc)
November 28, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Wed Nov 28 14:09:09 CST 2018 (crt)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/28/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2019. Motions due by 7/22/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/22/2019. Discovery due by 6/21/2019. Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2019. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginningNovember 18, 2019 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 11/28/2018) (skg)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Ben E. Keith Company. (Rutherford, Jay)
October 30, 2018 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. Tue Oct 30 11:44:43 CDT 2018 (crt)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCEAND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before November 27, 2018. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 10/30/2018) (skg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bdb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ben E. Keith Company. See doc #1 for image. (bdb)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 48th District Court Tarrant County, case number 048-303595-18 filed by Ben E. Keith Company. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9549509) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-6, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-7, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A-8, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #11 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #12 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Cover Sheet) (Rutherford, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrand v. Ben E. Keith Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa R Ferrand
Represented By: John L Yates
Represented By: Chris Wayne Stenholm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben E. Keith Company
Represented By: Sara Harris
Represented By: Allison Allman
Represented By: Jay K Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?