Low-T Physicians Service, P.L.L.C. et al v. UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Low-T Physicians Service, P.L.L.C., Low-T Physicians Professional Association and Low-T Physicians Group, P.L.L.C.
Defendant: Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C., Evercare of Texas, L.L.C., United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc. and United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00938
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' Appendix in Support of Response to Motion to Remand filed by Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc. re #10 (wxc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Response to Motion to Remand filed by Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc. (wxc)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER #8 ... The court ORDERS that defendants' motion be, and is hereby, granted, and defendants be, and are hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00 p.m. on January 18, 2019, in which to respond to plaintiffs' motion to remand. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 1/9/2019) (wxc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Remand filed by Evercare of Texas, L.L.C., Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc. (wxc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Appendix in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Low-T Physicians Group, P.L.L.C., Low-T Physicians Professional Association, Low-T Physicians Service, P.L.L.C. re #6 MOTION to Remand (wxc)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Low-T Physicians Group, P.L.L.C., Low-T Physicians Professional Association, Low-T Physicians Service, P.L.L.C. (wxc)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Notice of Removal and #2 Certificate of Interested Persons received pursuant to standing order. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Additional Page(s), #3 Additional Page(s), #4 Additional Page(s), #5 Additional Page(s), #6 Additional Page(s) COIP) (bdb)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 11/21/2018) (wxc)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Evercare of Texas, L.L.C., Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for Evercare of Texas, L.L.C., Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C., UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.. (Jubinsky, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 342nd District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 342-303717-18 filed by UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc., Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC, Evercare of Texas, L.L.C., UnitedHealth Group, Inc., United Healthcare, Inc., United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc., United Healthcare Services, Inc., UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9600450) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) 1, #4 Exhibit(s) 2, #5 Exhibit(s) 3, #6 Exhibit(s) 4) (Jubinsky, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Low-T Physicians Service, P.L.L.C. et al v. UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Low-T Physicians Service, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: David J Moraine
Represented By: Ralph H Duggins
Represented By: Stephen Lyle Tatum, Jr
Represented By: Philip A Vickers
Represented By: Allison Paige Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Low-T Physicians Professional Association
Represented By: David J Moraine
Represented By: Ralph H Duggins
Represented By: Stephen Lyle Tatum, Jr
Represented By: Philip A Vickers
Represented By: Allison Paige Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Low-T Physicians Group, P.L.L.C.
Represented By: David J Moraine
Represented By: Ralph H Duggins
Represented By: Stephen Lyle Tatum, Jr
Represented By: Philip A Vickers
Represented By: Allison Paige Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum Health Care Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare Community Plan of Texas, L.L.C.
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evercare of Texas, L.L.C.
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Benefits of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealthcare of Texas, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Services, Inc.
Represented By: Raymond Earl Walker
Represented By: Andrew G Jubinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?