Mendez v. Dollar General Store et al

Plaintiff: Amanda Gail Mendez
Defendant: John Doe and Dollar General Store
Case Number: 4:2018cv00990
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Having reviewed the Motion, briefing, and applicable case law, the Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion should be and is hereby GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/28/2019) (skg)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Dollar General Store re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 41(a)(2) (Barbero, Ignacio)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 PLAINTIFFS' BRIEF TO THE COURT ON SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION filed by Amanda Gail Mendez re #9 Order Setting Deadline/Hearing, Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Spalding, Thad)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to brief the Court on subject matter jurisdiction in this case on or before January 24, 2019. Defendant may respond by January 31, 2019 and Plaintiff may reply by February 7, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/17/2019) (skg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss per FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by Amanda Gail Mendez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Spalding, Thad)
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thad D Spalding on behalf of Amanda Gail Mendez. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Spalding, Thad)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 3/15/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2019. Motions due by 8/5/2019. Deadline for mediation is on or before 6/5/2019. Discovery due by 7/5/2019. Pretrial Order due by 11/7/2019. This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginningDecember 2, 2019 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 2nd Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/14/2019) (skg)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by Dollar General Store. (Barbero, Ignacio)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before January 15, 2019. (see order for specifics) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 12/18/2018) (tln)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dollar General Store. (Hummert, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from County Court at Law No. 1, Parker County, case number CIV-18-0868 filed by Dollar General Store. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9645480) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Hummert, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Dollar General Store et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Store
Represented By: Michael A Hummert
Represented By: Ignacio Barbero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Gail Mendez
Represented By: Thad D Spalding
Represented By: Thomas E McElyea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?