Gutierrez v. USA
Petitioner: Sebastian Gutierrez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00054
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Pet: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by AUSA. Leigha A Simonton-DOJ added as AUSA. (Simonton-DOJ, Leigha)
March 4, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Mon Mar 4 11:25:26 CST 2019 (crt)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND INSTRUCTIONS TO PARTIES IN A MOTION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2255. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the motion and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Wes Hendrix-DOJ for USA added. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 3/4/2019) (skg)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 4:16-CR-155-O) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mpw)
January 18, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. , and a form motion for relief under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (with the cause number stamped thereon) has been mailed to defendant/movant for completion Fri Jan 18 09:49:14 CST 2019 (crt)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Sebastian Gutierrez must address the following deficiency: The motion for relief under 28 U.S.C. 2255 is not on the proper form. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 30 days. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 1/17/2019) (skg)
January 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2. Wed Jan 16 15:43:12 CST 2019 (crt)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (edm)
January 16, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee is not due for this case. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: staff attorney DK. (edm)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 (Criminal Case Number 4:16-cr-155-O) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (edm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Wes Hendrix-DOJ
Represented By: Leigha A Simonton-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sebastian Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?