Bailey v. TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kimberly N. Bailey
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc., Franklin McLean and TransAm Trucking Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00096
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Torts/Pers Inj: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Franklin McLean (npk)
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Franklin McLean, TransAm Trucking, Inc. filed by Kimberly N. Bailey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on March 21, 2019, plaintiff file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiff's Amended Complaint" in compliance with the pleading requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure' and the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned, and that by 4:00 p.m. on April 4, 2019, defendants file an answer or other response to such Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/7/2019) (npk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Franklin McLean. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (npk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Franklin McLean. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney William Frederick Allred added to party Franklin McLean(pty:dft) (Allred, William) [NOD]
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE by Kimberly N. Bailey (NOD) (npk)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy pursuant to Standing Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by TransAm Trucking, Inc. (npk)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/4/2019) (npk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (npk)
February 4, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Kimberly N. Bailey (filed in State Court; see doc. #1). (npk)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Allred, William)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 352nd District Court, Tarrant County, Texas, case number 352-305295-19 filed by TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9754404) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Allred, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly N. Bailey
Represented By: Rob Loar
Represented By: Amy Kathleen Witherite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: William Frederick Allred
Represented By: Amy Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin McLean
Represented By: William Frederick Allred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking Inc
Represented By: William Frederick Allred
Represented By: Amy Agnew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?