Quorum International Inc v. Minka Lighting Inc

Plaintiff: Quorum International Inc
Defendant: Minka Lighting Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00102
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 4/24/2019 by 4pm (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/25/2019) (wrb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS by Minka Lighting Inc. (wrb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Minka Lighting Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. If additional patent or trademark numbers are included, the clerk will prepare the appropriate Report to the Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office.Attorney Lars L Berg added to party Minka Lighting Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Myall S Hawkins added to party Minka Lighting Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa H Meyerhoff added to party Minka Lighting Inc(pty:dft) (wrb)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Minka Lighting Inc ; served by process server on 3/1/2019. (wrb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Minka Lighting Inc. (wrb)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Quorum International Inc. (Schwartz, Richard)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy received pursuant to #7 Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint, filed by Quorum International Inc. (npk)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Unfiling #6 Judge's Copies filed by Quorum International Inc due to the following deficiency: exhibits located in same vol as docs; judge's copies bear typed, not original signatures. re: #6 Notice (Other), If Quorum wishes to retrieve items from the clerk, it must do so by 2pm Feb 12 2019. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/8/2019) (wrb)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 ***UNFILED PER #7 ORDER***Received original/copy of case originating documents pursuant to Standing Order re: #2 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Quorum International Inc (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) COIP) (wrb) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (tln).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Report to Patent/Trademark Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 120 e-mailed to notice_of_suit@uspto.gov. (wrb)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/5/2019) (wrb)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Quorum International Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Davoil, Inc. for Quorum International Inc. (Schwartz, Richard)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Minka Lighting Inc filed by Quorum International Inc. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9756587) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Cover Sheet) (Schwartz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quorum International Inc v. Minka Lighting Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quorum International Inc
Represented By: Thomas F Harkins, Jr
Represented By: Richard L Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minka Lighting Inc
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Represented By: Lars L Berg
Represented By: Lisa H Meyerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?