Reese et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Odessa Reese and Antonio Reese
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00120
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Real Property: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL JUDGMENT: Consistent with the joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice filed this date, the court ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the claims and causes of action of plaintiffs, Odessa Reese and Antonio Reese, against defendant, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., be, and are hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The court further ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that each party bear the attorney's fees and court costs incurred by that party. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/28/2019) (tln)
March 28, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Antonio Reese, Odessa Reese. (tln)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR REPLEADING: The court ORDERS that by 4:00 p.m. on March 29, 2019, plaintiffs file an amended pleading to be titled "Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint" in compliance with the pleading requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned, and that by 4:00 p.m. on April 12, 2019, defendant file an answer or other response to such Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint in compliance with the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rules of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, and the judge-specific requirements of the undersigned. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/15/2019) (tln)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/6/2019) (tln)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Antonio Reese, Odessa Reese. (tln)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The court ORDERS that defendant's motion be, and is hereby, granted, and defendant be, and is hereby, granted an extension of time until 4:00 p.m. on April 1, 2019, in which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' original petition. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/21/2019) (tln)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank NA. (tln)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (tln)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Judge McBryde's paper original and copy of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (tln)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/11/2019) (tln)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND from 48th Judicial District Court of Tarrant County, case number 048-305933-19 filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9770515) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Lewis, Wm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odessa Reese
Represented By: Chad A Norcross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Reese
Represented By: Chad A Norcross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Marcie L Schout
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Marcie L Schout
Represented By: Wm Lance Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?