Stecz-Hunter v. United States Department of Education et al
Plaintiff: Phyllis Darlene Stecz-Hunter
Defendant: Allied Interstate LLC and United States Department of Education
Case Number: 4:2019cv00142
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Referring Judge: Hal R Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew O'Hair Stromquist on behalf of Allied Interstate LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Stromquist, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT filed by United States Department of Education. (Civins-DOJ, Braden)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Stay of Administrative Wage Garnishment filed by Phyllis Darlene Stecz-Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (bdb)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before April 12, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/15/2019) (skg)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Defendant Allied Interstate LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead and #8 Defendant United States Department of Education's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Accordingly, Defendants are therefore ORDERED to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 22, 2019. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Hal R. Ray, Jr on 3/15/2019) (skg)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by United States Department of Education (Civins-DOJ, Braden)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Allied Interstate LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna-Katrina S Christakis on behalf of Allied Interstate LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Christakis, Anna-Katrina)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to All Defendants as to All Defendants. (Stecz-Hunter, Phyllis)
February 15, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3,4. cy to Stecz-Hunter Fri Feb 15 12:02:46 CST 2019 (crt)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (wrb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate Judge Ray preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wrb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons issued as to Allied Interstate LLC, United States Department of Education, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wrb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Original COMPLAINT against Allied Interstate LLC, United States Department of Education filed by Phyllis Darlene Stecz-Hunter. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number FW032185) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stecz-Hunter v. United States Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Interstate LLC
Represented By: Matthew O'Hair Stromquist
Represented By: Anna-Katrina S Christakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Education
Represented By: Braden Civins-DOJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Darlene Stecz-Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?