Burch et al v. Bonial & Associates, P.C. et al
Appellant: William Paul Burch
Undetermined: Case Admin Sup and Mark X Mullin
Appellee: Bonial & Associates, P.C. and Michael Burns
Case Number: 4:2019cv00168
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in < number 12-46959-mxm7 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:19-cv-168. (The filing fee is due to the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to < 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also < 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: <. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Mini Record, #2 Volume 2) (Rueter - BK, Karyn)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL #4 ... It is therefore ORDERED that Elizabeth Hayes is withdrawn as counsel for Bonial & Associates, P.C., and Michael Burns. Sammy Hooda is now counsel for Bonial & Associates, P.C., and Michael Burns in the above-styled and numbered case. All parties are directed to serve any notices on Bonial & Associates, P.C., and Michael Burns through Sammy Hooda, Bonial & Associates, P.C., 14841 Dallas Parkway, Suite 425, Dallas, Texas, 75254. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 3/14/2019) (wxc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL filed by Bonial & Associates, P.C., Michael Burns (wxc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 2/25/2019) (bdb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (bdb)
February 25, 2019 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) File to Judge McBryde. (bdb)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Waive Filing Fee(filed in bankruptcy court). Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the notice of appeal filed in #bankruptcy case number 18-04172-mxm and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 4:19-cv-168. (The filing fee is due to the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to #Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. See also #District Court Local Bankruptcy Rule 8012.1. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: #Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 initial docs) (Rueter - BK, Karyn) Modified on 2/26/2019 (twd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burch et al v. Bonial & Associates, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: William Paul Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Case Admin Sup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Mark X Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bonial & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Sammy Hooda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Burns
Represented By: Elizabeth Frances Hayes
Represented By: Sammy Hooda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?