Mossman v. Blue Sky Roofing LLC

Plaintiff: Vicky Mossman
Defendant: Blue Sky Roofing LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00383
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Reed C O'Connor
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Exception to Local Rule 83.10(a) filed by Blue Sky Roofing LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Fisk, Robert)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Sky Roofing LLC. (Fisk, Robert)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Blue Sky Roofing LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Robert Carson Fisk added to party Blue Sky Roofing LLC(pty:dft) (Fisk, Robert)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vicky Mossman re #1 Complaint,,,, (Fillmore, Charles)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Blue Sky Roofing LLC. (wrb)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Vicky Mossman. (Fillmore, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (tln)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Vicky Mossman. (Fillmore, Charles)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Sky Roofing LLC filed by Vicky Mossman. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9972072) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Fillmore, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mossman v. Blue Sky Roofing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Mossman
Represented By: H Dustin Fillmore, III
Represented By: Charles W Fillmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Sky Roofing LLC
Represented By: Robert Carson Fisk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?