Tran v. Mancl

Plaintiff: Thinh Tran
Defendant: Rachel Ralston Mancl
Case Number: 4:2019cv00384
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: John McBryde
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order of document #1 filed by Thinh Tran (edm)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Unfiling #7 Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to the standing order for the following deficiencies: The complaint's exhibits were filed in the same volume as the complaint and do not bear consecutive page numbers, index tabs, and a table of contents, nor are items of particular pertinence highlighted. The court ORDERS that such documents be, and are hereby, unfiled and stricken from the record of such action. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/13/2019) (edm)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 *** UNFILED PER ORDER #8 *** Judge McBryde's paper original and copies pursuant to standing order of document #1 , #2 , and #3 filed by Thinh Tran. (edm) Modified on 5/13/2019 (edm).
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Rachel Ralston Mancl. (edm)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge John McBryde on 5/9/2019) (edm)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge McBryde. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (edm)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Thinh Tran. (Jarzombek, Jerry)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thinh Tran. (Jarzombek, Jerry)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Rachel Ralston Mancl filed by Thinh Tran. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9974159) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Jarzombek, Jerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Mancl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thinh Tran
Represented By: Jerry J Jarzombek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Ralston Mancl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?